This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2020 at 12:02:56 (UTC).

BARBARA GATLIN ET AL VS OASIS C&D INCORPORATED ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/19/2008 BARBARA GATLIN filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against OASIS C D INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN, LEE SMALLEY EDMON and MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6586

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

LEE SMALLEY EDMON

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GATLIN BARBARA

SALAZAR ROSA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

JOHNSON DELLITA

MARTIN CINDY

OASIS C&D INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CAMPBELL FRANCES M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

4/17/2013: APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

4/17/2013: APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

Proof of Service -

9/5/2014: Proof of Service -

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketCost Bill After Judgment ($0 CREDITS $0 INTEREST $41,266.11 MEMO TO SCAN UNIT 9/17/15 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment (a.s. ); Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment (REJECTED-#1(D) INCOMPLETE-REQUIRES A NAME-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB; ALL IN ONE ); Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment (REJECTED: JUDGMENT AMOUNT RETURNED TO ATTY SVC ); Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • DocketCost Bill After Judgment ($1138.00 MEMO TO SCAN UNIT 05/08/13 NO COURT FILE CREDIT $0.00 INTEREST $50,205.80); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • DocketNotice (of renewal of judgment (2) issued ); Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address (FRACES M. CAMPBELL CAMPBELLL & FARAHANI LLP 15233 VENTURA BLVD. SUITE 408 SHERMAN OAKS , CA, 91403 TELEPHONE # 818-999-4242 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • DocketRenewal of Judgment (IN THE AMOUNT OF $171,160.56 FILED ); Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; OSC - No Return of Service (OASIS C&D INCORPORATED, DELLITAJOHNSON, CINDY MARTIN) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2008
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • DocketNotice (OF REASSIGNMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • DocketNotice (REASSIGNMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2008
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2008
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • Docketat 10:30 am in Department 1, Lee Smalley Edmon, Presiding; Order Re: Reassignment of Case - Transferred to different departmnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2008
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: BC396586 Hearing Date: July 19, 2021 Dept: 39

Barbara Gatlin, et\r\nal. v. Oasis C&D Incorporated, et al.

\r\n\r\n

Case No. BC396586

\r\n\r\n

Motion for\r\nAttorney’s Fees

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff\r\nBarbara Gatlin (“Plaintiff”) obtained a judgment against Defendant Oasis\r\nC&D Incorporated on January 30, 2009. \r\nThe judgment includes attorney’s fees. \r\nNow, Plaintiff seeks additional attorney’s fees incurred in connection\r\nwith enforcement of that judgment.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

A judgment creditor may file a\r\nnoticed motion to recover reasonable and necessary costs associated with\r\nenforcement of the judgment. Such costs\r\nmay include attorneys’ fees if the underlying judgment provides for an award of\r\nattorneys’ fees. (Code Civ. Proc., §\r\n685.040.) The judgment creditor must\r\nfile the motion before the judgment is fully satisfied but not later than two\r\nyears after the costs were incurred. \r\n(Code Civ. Proc., § 685.080, subd. (a).) \r\nIn the motion, the judgment creditor must specify the type and amount of\r\nthe costs, and support those costs with evidence showing that the costs are\r\ncorrect, reasonable and necessary, and have not been satisfied. (Code Civ. Proc., § 685.080, subd. (b).)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff advances billing records,\r\nwhich reflect attorney time spent working on demurrers, motions to strike, case\r\nmanagement conferences, and default judgments. \r\n(Declaration of Frances M Campbell, Exhibit A.) No such proceedings have occurred in\r\nconnection this case within the two years prior to the filing of this\r\nmotion. Even if the Court assumes these\r\nbilling records relate to the fraudulent transfer action Plaintiff filed, Gatlin v. Johnson, et al., (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2018, No. BC711889), the\r\ndeclarations Plaintiff advances do not explain how these attorneys’ fees were\r\nreasonable and necessary to the enforcement of the judgment in this\r\nmatter.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Based upon the foregoing, the\r\nmotion for attorney’s fees is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff shall provide notice and file proof\r\nof such with the Court.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OASIS C&D INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMPBELL FRANCES MILLER