Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/29/2016 at 18:58:19 (UTC).

BARBARA GAINES VS. CURTIS ROBINSON, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2009 BARBARA GAINES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CURTIS ROBINSON, JR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSE HOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2926

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSE HOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAINES BARBARA

Petitioner

2063 E. WAYSIDE ST.

Defendants

BANK OF AMERICA

ROBINSON JR. CURTIS

DOES 1 THROUGH 30 INCLUSIVE

Respondent

REYES AVERARDO A.

Others

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

VAN LEESTEN ANDREA G. ESQ.

Not Classified By Court

BARR ELEANOR O.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUBIN ROBERT F. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

DOMINGUEZ LAW GROUP

LAW OFFICES OF MARILEE JONES-COFIELD

MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2010
  • Notice for Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2010
  • Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIP & ORDER TO CONTINUE OSC DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • Notice (OF OSC RE DISM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • Statement-Agreement (Full) Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • Notice-Reassgnment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • Notice-Reassgnment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • Notice-Recusal-ADR Neutral Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • Amended Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIP TO ALLOW DEFT TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO CP ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2009
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • Notice of Pending Action Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • Amendment to Complaint (DOE 1 - BANK OF AMERICA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2001
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2001
  • Journal Converted from DOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2001
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBIN ROBERT F.