This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2021 at 19:21:39 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS. SAV-ON-MONOLAN, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/01/2008 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAV-ON-MONOLAN, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ, RALPH C. HOFER and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7457

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

RALPH C. HOFER

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendants

DAGSTANYAN GRANT

SAV-ON-MONOLAN INC.

DAGSTANYAN DAN G.

HARBINGER INTERNATIONAL

Assignee

BECHAROFF CAPITAL CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

ROTH RAOUL Y.

ASSIGNEE OF RECORD BECHAROFF CAPITAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HEMAR ROUSSO & HERALD LLP

DURKEE JAMES ELLIOTT

Assignee and Defendant Attorneys

BREWER & BREWER

SARA BEDIRIAN ESQ.

FORBERG TONY

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BREWER LANCE ALAN

 

Court Documents

Assignment of Judgment

11/2/2015: Assignment of Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/2/2015: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/20/2017: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Writ of Execution

1/4/2018: Writ of Execution

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

6/18/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

8/17/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-09-28 00:00:00

9/28/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-09-28 00:00:00

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

11/30/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/20/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ - Return

2/14/2019: Writ - Return

Proof of Service (Renewal of Judgment)

3/14/2019: Proof of Service (Renewal of Judgment)

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

9/30/2019: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest -

7/18/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest -

Writ of Execution -

8/3/2018: Writ of Execution -

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination -

8/17/2018: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination -

Affidavit -

8/17/2018: Affidavit -

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Sheriff Dept.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Motion to Quash Service of Application and Order For Appearance and Examination) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Motion to Quash Service of Application and Order For Appearance and Examination) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Grant Dagstanyan) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Mary R. Rickey, CSR 11252); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketReply (REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION); Filed by Grant Dagstanyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Opposition to Motion to Quash Service of Application and Order for Appearance and Examination); Filed by Becharoff Capital Corporation (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Becharoff Capital Corporation (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC047457    Hearing Date: October 24, 2019    Dept: E

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

Date: 10/25/19

Case: Bank of America N.A. v. Sav-On-Monolan, et al. (EC 047457)

TENTATIVE RULING:

At the hearing on Defendant Grant Dagstanyan’s Motion to Quash Service of Application and Order for Appearance and Examination, the parties should be prepared to address the following:

· What authority does the Court possess to quash an Order to Appear for Examination that has been properly served in accordance with CCP § 708.110 [Order for examination; service; contents] but has not been properly served in accordance with CCP § 708.170 [Failure to appear after service of order; improper service].

· How the parties intend to proceed if the Court finds that the Order to Appear for Examination was properly served in accordance with CCP § 708.110 but that the Court has no power to act upon any failure to appear because such service of the Order was not made in accordance with CCP § 708.170.