This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 09:47:04 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS DANIEL E MILLS ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2013 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DANIEL E MILLS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2960

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

MILLS DANIEL E.

MILLS LORI F.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ALL PERSON UNKNOWN

AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK

FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

HERBERT P. SEARS CO. INC.

LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

MILLS DANIEL E.

MILLS LORI F.

MILLS RITA

MILLS STEVEN J.

UNILEV MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

UNITED STATE OF AMERICAN

UNITED STATES OF AMERICAN

UNKNOWN ALL PERSON

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MILLS RITA

MILLS STEVEN J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EPSTEIN TURNER WEISS APC

EPSTEIN TURNER WEISS PC

BLANK ROME LLP.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KRAFT MARCIA L. LAW OFFICES OF

MANELLA NORA M. UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

PANICKER SAYUJ DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL

MARCIA L. KRAFT LAW OFFICES OF

JOZEL BRUNETT CHIEF COUNSEL

ANDRE BIROTTE JR. UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

MANSOUR LAW GROUP

JOHN F. KRATTLI COUNTY COUNSEL

KRAFT MILES & MILLER LLP

Other Attorneys

PC EPSTEIN TURNER WEISS

BLANK ROME LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

2/1/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

4/9/2018: Minute Order -

COMPLAINT FOR 1. EQUITABLE LIEN; ETC

9/27/2013: COMPLAINT FOR 1. EQUITABLE LIEN; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/8/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

2/19/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

2/21/2014: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF BRENDAN F. HUG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/5/2014: DECLARATION OF BRENDAN F. HUG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order -

11/20/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

2/2/2015: Minute Order -

STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT IMPOSING EQUITABLE LIEN IN FAVOR OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

3/5/2015: STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT IMPOSING EQUITABLE LIEN IN FAVOR OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

DECLARATION OF RITA MILLS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND ANY DEFAULT JUDGMENT

5/13/2015: DECLARATION OF RITA MILLS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND ANY DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF RULING

6/12/2015: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order -

9/15/2015: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

11/5/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/18/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DECLARATION OF STEVEN MILLS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/4/2017: DECLARATION OF STEVEN MILLS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA N.A.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT LORI F. MILLS

8/17/2017: PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA N.A.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT LORI F. MILLS

PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA N.A.'S NOTICE OF PARTIAL CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

10/27/2017: PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA N.A.'S NOTICE OF PARTIAL CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

158 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 45; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Case Deemed Settled) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketJOINT NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 45; Status Conference (Status Conference; Trial Date Set) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 45; (Settlement Conference; Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
321 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketUNITED STATES OF AMERICAS DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by United States of American (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Tax Collector (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DocketDEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTORS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR (1) EQUITABLE LIEN; (2) DECLARATORY RELIEF; AND (3) JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE OF EQUITABLE LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR 1. EQUITABLE LIEN; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less