This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 09:38:19 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS CRISTCAT FARMERS MARKET INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/04/2011 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CRISTCAT FARMERS MARKET INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5062

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendants

AZINIAN KARINA

AZINIAN ROBERT

BOBARI CORPORATION

CRISTCAT CALABASAS INC

CRISTCAT FARMERS MARKET INC

CRISTCAT HOLLYWOOD INC

CRISTCAT PASADENA INC

CRISTCAT WASHINGTON INC

CRISTCAT WASHINGTON PACIFIC INC

DOES 1-100

THE CRISTCAT GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COX PAMELA LORRAINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2012
  • Writ-Execution (WRIT ISSUED TO LA ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • Abstract (ABSTRACT ISSUED ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • Miscellaneous (REJECTION: WRIT & ABSTRACT SUB. 6/12/12, PLEASE USE ATTACHMENT 18 FOR ADDITIONAL JUDGMENT DEBTORS. ) Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • Declaration (OF SANDRA I. TIBERI RE DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • Judgment (JUDGMENT PER STIPULATION AFTER DEFAULT OF SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • Order-Dismissal (NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP664.6 ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • Notice-Related Cases (WITH LC092773 (DEPARTMENT Y) ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • Summons-Issued Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRISTCAT PASADENA INC. is a litigant