This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 19:07:37 (UTC).

BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL LLC VS JR MILFORD INC ET A

Case Summary

On 01/09/2013 BANC OF AMERICA LEASING CAPITAL LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JR MILFORD INC ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD M. SOHIGIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8798

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL LLC

Defendants and Respondents

AZINIAN KARINA

AZINIAN ROBERT

CRISTCAT CALABASAS INC.

CRISTCAT FARMERS MARKET INC.

CRISTCAT GROUP INC. THE

CRISTCAT HOLLYWOOD INC.

CRISTCAT PASADENA INC.

CRISTCAT WASHINGTON INC.

CRISTCAT WASHINGTON PACIFIC INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

J.R. CERRITOS INC.

JOHN OF ARC INC.

JOHNNY ROCKETS RANCHO MIRAGE LLC

JR MILFORD INC.

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PARKER MILLIKEN CLARK O'HARA & SAMUELIAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

1/9/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ? MASTER LEASE AGREEMENT; ETC

1/9/2013: COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ? MASTER LEASE AGREEMENT; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/16/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/24/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

6/11/2013: Minute Order -

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 41, Ronald M. Sohigian, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Case Deemed Settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (of summons ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JR MILFORD INC. is a litigant