This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 18:57:00 (UTC).

BALLENTINE, SILVIA VS BALLENTINE, DION DERRICK

Case Summary

On 09/21/2016 BALLENTINE, SILVIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BALLENTINE, DION DERRICK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GELFOUND, DAVID B.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3500

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GELFOUND, DAVID B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BALLENTINE SILVIA

Claimant

LOS ANGELES COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION

Respondent

BALLENTINE DION DERRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

SALON ELAINE KAREN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (signed on 3-27-19 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Joinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Joinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Joinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Joinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ballentine, Silvia - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ballentine, Silvia - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2017
  • 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 01-12-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 01-26-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ballentine, Silvia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Declaration (Com Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ballentine, Silvia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ballentine, Silvia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ballentine, Silvia - Denied on 2016-09-21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ballentine, Silvia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ballentine, Silvia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ballentine, Silvia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less