This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 00:08:42 (UTC).

AYJAY MATTHEWS VS 20033 SATICOY LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/28/2016 AYJAY MATTHEWS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 20033 SATICOY LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8472

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MATTHEWS AYJAY

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1-20

MBL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

COMMERCIAL REALTY CONSULTANTS INC

20033 SATICOY LP

MBK MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MAURO FIORE JR

Defendant Attorney

CP LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

1/2/2018: Notice of Settlement

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

2/7/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/3/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

7/28/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

7/28/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/13/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/13/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/13/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/4/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/2/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

5/2/2017: Unknown

DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

10/10/2017: DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/10/2017: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

20033 SATICOY LP AND MBK MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; DECLARATION OF VANESSA POULAD

11/7/2017: 20033 SATICOY LP AND MBK MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; DECLARATION OF VANESSA POULAD

ORDER

11/7/2017: ORDER

Minute Order

11/7/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC.

11/9/2017: NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Ayjay Matthews (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 91; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Ayjay Matthews (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 91; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2017
  • Answer; Filed by 20033 Saticoy LP (Defendant); MBK Management Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ayjay Matthews (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ayjay Matthews (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ayjay Matthews (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Ayjay Matthews (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20033 SATICOY LP is a litigant

Latest cases where MBK MANAGEMENT CORPORATION is a litigant