Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 04:19:39 (UTC).

AVI BASHAREL VS. CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO., LLC, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/09/2015 AVI BASHAREL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO , LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUSSELL STEVEN KUSSMAN and VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3540

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUSSELL STEVEN KUSSMAN

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BASHAREL AVI

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO. LLC

DOES 1-10

SCHMUEL SCHLOMO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SCHMUEL SCHLOMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMALL LEON

Defendant Attorneys

QUINTANA ANDRES FELIPE

WILKINSON CLAY RYAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Motion to Quash; Filed by Schlomo Schmuel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Notice (of Continuance); Filed by Avi Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Conference (-Telephonic) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Conference -Telephonic)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Notice (of Continuance); Filed by Avi Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
227 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-02-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Ex Parte Application (to Advance Hearing Date on Demurrer to Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Default Entered; Filed by Avi Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Request-Dismissal-Partial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Notice-Demurrer; Filed by Schlomo Schmuel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Notice of Lodging; Filed by Avi Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Avi Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Avi Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Avi Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUINTANA ANDRES FELIPE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILKINSON CLAY R.