This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 03:43:50 (UTC).

AVETTIS AVETISYAN VS ROBERT AZINIAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/29/2011 AVETTIS AVETISYAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBERT AZINIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8545

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVETISYAN AVETTIS

Defendants

AZINIAN KARINE

AZINIAN ROBERT

ROCNEVA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOSTER RICHARD M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ANDERSON ALLAN E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT (2) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, (3) FAILURE TO OBSERVE CORPORATE FORMALITIES, (4) FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT TO CONTRACT, AND (5) UNJUST ENRICHMENT

8/29/2011: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT (2) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, (3) FAILURE TO OBSERVE CORPORATE FORMALITIES, (4) FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT TO CONTRACT, AND (5) UNJUST ENRICHMENT

SUMMONS -

8/29/2011: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/7/2011: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/15/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/15/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/20/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

12/21/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

12/29/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

1/17/2012: Minute Order -

IPROPOSED1 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

7/9/2012: IPROPOSED1 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES 90 DAYS; DECLARATION OF KOLLIN I. Z1MMERMANN;

7/9/2012: STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES 90 DAYS; DECLARATION OF KOLLIN I. Z1MMERMANN;

Minute Order -

7/9/2012: Minute Order -

IPROPOSEDI ORDER GRANT1G STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELKED DATES

7/9/2012: IPROPOSEDI ORDER GRANT1G STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELKED DATES

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING; THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES 90 DAYS; DECLARATION OF KOLLIN J. ZIMMERMANN; IPROPOSEDI ORDER

7/10/2012: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING; THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES 90 DAYS; DECLARATION OF KOLLIN J. ZIMMERMANN; IPROPOSEDI ORDER

Minute Order -

7/10/2012: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF KOLLIN I ZIMMERMANN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/12/2012: DECLARATION OF KOLLIN I ZIMMERMANN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF VIRGINAI SHEK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/12/2012: DECLARATION OF VIRGINAI SHEK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF ROBERT AZINIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/12/2012: DECLARATION OF ROBERT AZINIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62; (Motion Hearing; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2013-06-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62; (Motion Hearing; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2013-06-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Avettis Avetisyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
267 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Avettis Avetisyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT (2) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, (3) FAILURE TO OBSERVE CORPORATE FORMALITIES, (4) FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT TO CONTRACT, AND (5) UNJUST ENRICHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROCNEVA INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION DBA JOHNNY ROCKETS SILVERTON CASINO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON ALLAN E