This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 00:40:31 (UTC).

AVAYA INC VS RAZORGATOR INC

Case Summary

On 10/14/2011 AVAYA INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAZORGATOR INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1593

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVAYA INC.

Defendants

RAZORGATOR INC.

RAZORGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP INC. FKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRISCHER MICHAEL D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

PLATT DANIEL A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

6/27/2012: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order -

5/29/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

5/8/2012: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Minute Order -

3/22/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

3/20/2012: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

3/12/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

3/5/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

3/5/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

DECLARATION OF LEON PERRY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT RAZORGATOR, INC. TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR STAY OF ACTION

2/24/2012: DECLARATION OF LEON PERRY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT RAZORGATOR, INC. TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR STAY OF ACTION

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT RAZORGATOR, INC. TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR STAY OF ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

2/24/2012: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT RAZORGATOR, INC. TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR STAY OF ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

2/14/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF REARING

1/18/2012: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF REARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGE1IENT CONFERENCE

10/25/2011: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGE1IENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service -

10/24/2011: Proof of Service -

SUMMONS -

10/14/2011: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY

10/14/2011: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Avaya, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 12; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 13; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Avaya, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 13; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Deemed Settled) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketNOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF REARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGE1IENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Avaya, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Avaya, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAZORGATOR INTERACTIVE GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Avaya Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLATT DANIEL ADAM