Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 04:07:02 (UTC).

AUSTIN GUERRERO VS VALLEY CHRISTIAN HIGH SCHOOL, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 05/01/2012 AUSTIN GUERRERO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VALLEY CHRISTIAN HIGH SCHOOL, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL, GAIL FEUER, ROY L. PAUL, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ, ELIA WEINBACH, SAMANTHA P. JESSNER and RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1044

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

GAIL FEUER

ROY L. PAUL

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

ELIA WEINBACH

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUERRERO AUSTIN

Defendants

VALLEY CHRISTIAN HIGH SCHOOL

ZOETEWAY ROBERT

ZOETEWAY ROBERT (ERRONEOUSLY SUED)

ZOETEWEY MICHAEL

ZOETEWAY ROBERT ERRONEOUSLY SUED

WAIT THOMAS B.

Not Classified By Court

KESSLER ARNOLD

Minor

GUERRERO AUSTIN ( )

Other

GUERRERO DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS B. WAIT

WAIT & COLFER

Other Attorney

OWEN PATTERSON & OWEN

Other Attorneys

PIERCE B. GENE JR. ESQ

BOB GENE PIERCE

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, TRIAL AND ALL DATES ATTENDANT THERETO

4/18/2013: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, TRIAL AND ALL DATES ATTENDANT THERETO

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

5/10/2013: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

Minute Order -

7/12/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING ON OWEN, PATTERSON & OWEN?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

7/18/2013: NOTICE OF RULING ON OWEN, PATTERSON & OWEN?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

DECLARATION OF MARK BROERSMA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY ADJUDICATION

9/11/2013: DECLARATION OF MARK BROERSMA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY ADJUDICATION

PROOF OF SERVICE

9/11/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE

OBJECTTONS TO DECLARATION OF MARK BROERSMA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/20/2013: OBJECTTONS TO DECLARATION OF MARK BROERSMA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING EXCLUSION OF CERTAIN OPINION TESTIMONY OF CRAIG CUNNINGHAM MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER ONE

1/6/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING EXCLUSION OF CERTAIN OPINION TESTIMONY OF CRAIG CUNNINGHAM MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER ONE

MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING EXCLUSION OF CERTAIN OPINION TESTIMONY OF CRAIG CUNNINGHAM MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2

1/24/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING EXCLUSION OF CERTAIN OPINION TESTIMONY OF CRAIG CUNNINGHAM MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2

Minute Order -

1/29/2014: Minute Order -

EX PARTE MOTION: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS? ENTIRE MEMORANDUM OF COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF AUSTIN GUERRERO IN SUPPORT OF; IPROPOSEDI JUDGMENT O

4/3/2014: EX PARTE MOTION: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS? ENTIRE MEMORANDUM OF COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF AUSTIN GUERRERO IN SUPPORT OF; IPROPOSEDI JUDGMENT O

REPLY TO DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS? ENTIRE MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

7/10/2014: REPLY TO DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS? ENTIRE MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

NOTICE OF COURT?S CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE

7/22/2014: NOTICE OF COURT?S CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE

(REVISED) MEMORANDUM OF COSTS SUMMARY

8/13/2014: (REVISED) MEMORANDUM OF COSTS SUMMARY

DECLARATION OF AUSTIN GUERRERO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO RECONSIDER PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' ENTIRE MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

8/25/2014: DECLARATION OF AUSTIN GUERRERO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO RECONSIDER PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' ENTIRE MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AND AWARD OF COSTS

9/23/2014: JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AND AWARD OF COSTS

Minute Order -

12/1/2014: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/2/2015: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketRemittitur filed (REMITTITUR ISSUED ON 2/11/16 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketREMITTITUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketUnknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketNtc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketNtc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL (APPEL LANT) ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Record; Filed by AUSTIN (PRO PER) GUERRERO (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Record; Filed by Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
320 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by DAVID GUERRERO (Legacy Party); AUSTIN (PRO PER) GUERRERO (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointing GAL; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointng GAL (NAMING DAVID GUERRERO GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR AUSTIN GUERRERO ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed-No Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLEY CHRISTIAN HIGH SCHOOL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIERCE B. GENE JR. ESQ.