This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:16:22 (UTC).

AURORA GARCIA VS TJX COMPANIES ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/04/2016 AURORA GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TJX COMPANIES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9441

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GARCIA AURORA

Defendants and Respondents

TJX COMPANIES

MARMAXX GROUP

T.J. MAXX

T.K. MAXX

MARSHALS

DOES 1 TO 50

MARSHALLS MEGA STORE

MAXX T.J.

MAXX T.K.

MARSHALLS OF CA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF BOB B. KHAKSHOOY

KHAKSHOOY BOB BABAK ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

VU JACQUELINE KIEU ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

1/18/2018: Minute Order

AMENDED

2/5/2018: AMENDED

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

2/5/2018: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY MARSHALLS OF CA, LLC

2/28/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY MARSHALLS OF CA, LLC

Minute Order

3/21/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/5/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/12/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

3/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

SUMMONS

8/4/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) PREMISES LIABILITY; ETC

8/4/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) PREMISES LIABILITY; ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Marshalls Erroneously Sued As Marshalls of CA, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Trial, Final Status Conference, and Discovery and Motion cut-off Dates;) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application to C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; (OSC RE Dismissal; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketAMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-01-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Aurora Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) PREMISES LIABILITY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aurora Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC629441    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 2

Garcia v. TJX Companies, et al.

Defendant’s Motion to Bifurcate is DENIED.

1) The motion is not untimely made. The motion is required to be made no later than the close of pretrial conference or no later than 30 days before trial. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 598.

While not characterized as a “pre-trial conference,” the final status conference serves the same function in that all trial briefs, motions in limine, joint statements, exhibits, jury instructions and all other trial-related documents are required to be submitted by the date of the final status conference. See Second Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference, Personal Injury Courts, filed 8/9/19.

This motion is set to be heard one day before the FSC set for 12/19/19.

2) Defendant has not established that bifurcation will promote the ends of justice or the economy and efficiency of handling the litigation. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 598.

Bifurcation is appropriate in cases where the “liability issue is resolved against the plaintiff and bifurcation will avoid the waste of time and money caused by the unnecessary trial of damage questions.” Trickey v. Superior Court of Sacramento County (1967) 252 Cal. App. 2d 650, 653.

Separate phases are warranted to avoid wasting court time in cases where plaintiff loses on the liability issue. Foreman & Clark Corp. v. Fallon (1971) 3 Cal. 3d 875, 888, fn. 8.

Defendant concedes that liability is disputed given the Defendant’s employees’ testimony that a dangerous condition evident at the time of the incident. Declaration of Jackie Vu, Ex. B, 45:24-46:2, Ex. C, 38:11-22.

Defendant argues that if the jury believes Defendant’s employees, there will be no need to determine damages. That is true of every personal injury case, but this does not require that every personal injury case be bifurcated. The facts of a particular case must justify bifurcation. Foreman at 888, fn. 8.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.