This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2021 at 09:24:57 (UTC).

AURELIO CRUZ VS CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT

Case Summary

On 01/06/2009 AURELIO CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEEKA, PETER J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4631

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEEKA, PETER J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRUZ AURELIO JR.

Defendants

CHWC INC.

NUCCIO JOHN

CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT

Not Classified By Court

WARREN KAUFMAN/KEN WRIGHT

WRIGHT WARREN KAUFMAN/KEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEUSTADT JOHN R. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

CHA JOHN S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2010
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs; Filed by AURELIO JR. CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department O; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs; Filed by AURELIO JR. CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • DocketReceipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Non-Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JOHN NUCCIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • DocketDefault Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JOHN NUCCIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AURELIO JR. CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2009
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT AND NIGTCLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where C.H.W.C. INC A CORPORATION DBA CRAZY HORSE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHA JOHN S.