Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 14:10:54 (UTC).

AUDELIA LOPEZ ET AL VS JESUS D VALENCIANO RN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/07/2013 AUDELIA LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JESUS D VALENCIANO RN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL, DAVID SOTELO and DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3674

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

DAVID SOTELO

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GUTIERREZ BERTHA ELENA

GUTIERREZ CRYSTAL

GUTIERREZ ELSA

LOPEZ AUDELIA

LOPEZ ELIZABETH

LOPEZ JESUS ROBERTO

LOPEZ JOEL

LOPEZ MARIA APOLINARIA

LOPEZ MARIA EUGENIA

LOPEZ MARICRUZ PATRICIA

Defendants and Respondents

DA VITA HEALTHCARE PARTNERS INC.

DA VITA HEALTHCARE PARTNERS PLAN INC.

DA VITA VILLAGEHEALTH OF CALIFORNIA INC.

DS VITA

KINDRED HEALTHCARE DEVELOPMENT INC.

KINDRED HEALTHCARE INC.

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC.

KINDRED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA KINDRED HOSPITAL

VALENCIANO JESUS D. R.N.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

VALENCIANO JESUS D. R.N.

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BARENS ARTHUR H.

LAW OFFICES OF ARTHUR H. BARENS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FOROOZANDEH MAJID ESQ.

GIOVANNIELLO LAW GROUP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

GIOVANNIELLO LAW GROUP P.C.

LAW OFFICE OF FOROOZANDEH APC.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GIOVANNIELLO LAW GROUP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

3/23/2015: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

3/30/2015: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/2/2015: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/2/2015: Minute Order -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

10/7/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

11/25/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

11/25/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

11/25/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

12/7/2015: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

12/7/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

12/15/2015: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

12/23/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

12/23/2015: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE INC.

12/23/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE INC.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE, INC.

12/23/2015: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE, INC.

DECLARATION OF JEREMY BALLARD TN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, NC.

12/24/2015: DECLARATION OF JEREMY BALLARD TN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, NC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

1/19/2016: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL. INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

2/2/2016: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL. INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R; (Osc Re Dismissal; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketRecpt.of Depos.of Ord. to Dep.Mon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R; (Osc Re Dismissal; Matter is continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R; (Osc Re Dismissal; Matter is continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
207 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 91, Michael J. Raphael, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Docketat 01:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; No Appearance) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Docketat 01:00 am in Department 91, Michael J. Raphael, Presiding; Final Status Conference - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AUDELIA LOPEZ (Plaintiff); JESUS ROBERTO LOPEZ (Plaintiff); MARIA APOLINARIA LOPEZ (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOROOZANDEH MAJID ESQ.