This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 18:49:10 (UTC).

ATTACK! MARKETING LLC VS VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2012 ATTACK MARKETING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4033

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ATTACK! MARKETING LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

SEDLACEK SHAWN AKA SEDLACEK SHAWN T./DO

VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC.

VOX STAFFING LLC

SEDLACEK SHAWN AKA T./DO

Cross Defendants

ANNIE MCALLISTER

CARTER REESE

CHRIS WU

HATCHIM LLC

JOSH MELE

MCALLISTER ANNIE

REESE CARTER

MELE JOSH

WU CHRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AIRES TIMOTHY CARL ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SALOMONS GARY K. ESQ.

LIBERATORE ANTHONY A. ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorney

GABRIEL JONATHAN G. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; BREACH OF IMPLIED IN FACT CONTRACT; OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT; ACCOUNT STATED; QUANTUM MERUIT

5/4/2012: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; BREACH OF IMPLIED IN FACT CONTRACT; OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT; ACCOUNT STATED; QUANTUM MERUIT

DUE DILIGENCE DECLARATION

6/14/2012: DUE DILIGENCE DECLARATION

PROOF OF SERVICE AND COMPLAINT

8/21/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE AND COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

10/9/2012: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTWF AND CROSS- DEFENDANT, ATTACK! MARKETING LLC?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS. COMPLAINT

12/17/2012: DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTWF AND CROSS- DEFENDANT, ATTACK! MARKETING LLC?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS. COMPLAINT

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ATTACK! MARKETING LLC TO STRIKE CROSS- COMPLAINT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC., OR PORTIONS THEREOF

12/21/2012: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ATTACK! MARKETING LLC TO STRIKE CROSS- COMPLAINT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC., OR PORTIONS THEREOF

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF CR0SS-DEFENDANT ATTACK! MARKETING LLC TO CROSS- COMPLAINT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC.

12/21/2012: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF CR0SS-DEFENDANT ATTACK! MARKETING LLC TO CROSS- COMPLAINT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC.

CROSS-DEFENDANTS, CARTER REESE, CHRIS WU, JOSH MELE, ANNIE MCCALISTER AND IIATCH.IM, LLC?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSSCOMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPP

2/4/2013: CROSS-DEFENDANTS, CARTER REESE, CHRIS WU, JOSH MELE, ANNIE MCCALISTER AND IIATCH.IM, LLC?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSSCOMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPP

NOTICE OF MOTION OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ATTACK! MARKETING TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC., OR PORTIONS THEREOF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

2/6/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ATTACK! MARKETING TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC., OR PORTIONS THEREOF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

2/14/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/22/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AND CROSS- DEFENDANT, ATTACK! MARKETING LLC'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT:

2/27/2013: DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AND CROSS- DEFENDANT, ATTACK! MARKETING LLC'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT:

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ATTACK! MARKETING LLC TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CROSS COMPLAINANT VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC. [C.C.P. ?430.10]

3/4/2013: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ATTACK! MARKETING LLC TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CROSS COMPLAINANT VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC. [C.C.P. ?430.10]

Minute Order -

4/10/2013: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC.?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

6/19/2013: DEFENDANT, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC.?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

NOTICE RULING ON DEFENDANT, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC.?S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

7/10/2013: NOTICE RULING ON DEFENDANT, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC.?S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

Minute Order -

11/12/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF ATTACK! MARKETING LLC FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO FIRST AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC. AND VOX STAFFING LLC TO FIRST AMENDED COMPL

11/25/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF ATTACK! MARKETING LLC FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO FIRST AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC. AND VOX STAFFING LLC TO FIRST AMENDED COMPL

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 12; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by Attack! Marketing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF ATTACK! MARKETING LLC FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO FIRST AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC. AND VOX STAFFING LLC TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 12; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketDUE DILIGENCE DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Attack! Marketing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketDUE DILIGENCE DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Attack! Marketing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; BREACH OF IMPLIED IN FACT CONTRACT; OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT; ACCOUNT STATED; QUANTUM MERUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VOX ENTERTAINMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where ATTACK MARKETING. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALOMONS GARY K. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIBERATORE ANTHONY ALBERT