This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 15:17:05 (UTC).

ASHLEY-REBEKAH FAULKNER VS ROOSEVELT HOTEL LLC

Case Summary

On 10/08/2013 ASHLEY-REBEKAH FAULKNER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ROOSEVELT HOTEL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR, EMILIE H. ELIAS and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3882

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

EMILIE H. ELIAS

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAULKNER ASHLEY-REBEKAH

Defendant

ROOSEVELT HOTEL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COUNSELONE PC

Defendant Attorneys

KULIK GOTTESMAN MOUTON & SIEGEL LLP

LITTLER MENDELSON A PROFESSIONAL CORP.

 

Court Documents

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MEAL-PERIOD LIABILITY UNDER LABOR CODE S 226.7; ETC

10/8/2013: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MEAL-PERIOD LIABILITY UNDER LABOR CODE S 226.7; ETC

SUMMONS -

10/8/2013: SUMMONS -

MOTION BY DEFENDANT ROOSEVELT HOTEL LLC FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED JUDGE; DECLARATION OF MARGARET H. GILLESPIE

1/8/2014: MOTION BY DEFENDANT ROOSEVELT HOTEL LLC FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED JUDGE; DECLARATION OF MARGARET H. GILLESPIE

NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

2/14/2014: NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order -

12/12/2016: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

1/12/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

2/15/2017: Minute Order -

Request for Dismissal -

3/8/2017: Request for Dismissal -

Minute Order -

3/21/2017: Minute Order -

Notice of Postponement - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/17/2017: Notice of Postponement - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Notice of Postponement - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/17/2017: Notice of Postponement - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Notice of Postponement - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/17/2017: Notice of Postponement - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order -

5/30/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/26/2017: Minute Order -

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketCase File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 310; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Ashley-Rebekah Faulkner (Plaintiff); Roosevelt Hotel, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 310; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC not held & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ashley-Rebekah Faulkner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Ashley-Rebekah Faulkner (Plaintiff); Roosevelt Hotel, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUINMANION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2014
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Ashley-Rebekah Faulkner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Ashley-Rebekah Faulkner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 311; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ashley-Rebekah Faulkner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Ashley-Rebekah Faulkner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ashley-Rebekah Faulkner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MEAL-PERIOD LIABILITY UNDER LABOR CODE S 226.7; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROOSEVELT HOTEL LLC is a litigant