This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2021 at 02:13:22 (UTC).

ASHLEIGH MIRANDA ET AL VS MARY E MIRANDA ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/15/2013 ASHLEIGH MIRANDA filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against MARY E MIRANDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, LUIS A. LAVIN and RONALD M. SOHIGIAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8408

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

LUIS A. LAVIN

RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

CIRRITO MICHELLE DENISE VELA

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

MIRANDA MARY E.

MIRANDA ROBERT

SEBASTIAN CIRRITO MICHAEL II

THE MIRANDA FAMILY TRUST

Guardian Ad Litem

BURLESON SHELLEY

Minors

MIRANDA ASHLEIGH

MIRANDA VINCENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor Attorneys

MARGOLESE VANA PARKER ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF ROGER S. SENDERS A.P.C.

LAW OFFICES OF GREGG J. GOLDFARB A.P.C.

Other Attorneys

MATISON MARGOLESE & KORN ALC

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH TR() RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

8/15/2013: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH TR() RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EXPARTE

8/15/2013: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EXPARTE

AP1L1CATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH TRO RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; WITH DECLARATION OF GREGG GOLDFARB; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUBMITTED SEPARATELY

8/15/2013: AP1L1CATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH TRO RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; WITH DECLARATION OF GREGG GOLDFARB; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUBMITTED SEPARATELY

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/16/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/21/2013: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

12/4/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

12/4/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

12/12/2013: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

12/24/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/19/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVTCE OF SUMMONS

2/19/2014: PROOF OF SERVTCE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/19/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

2/19/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

Minute Order -

9/16/2014: Minute Order -

ORDER ON EX PARTE MOTION AND MOTION TO CORRECT WORDING OF NAME OF DEFENDANT AND TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFAULT PROVE UP OR SHORTEN TIME

12/2/2014: ORDER ON EX PARTE MOTION AND MOTION TO CORRECT WORDING OF NAME OF DEFENDANT AND TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFAULT PROVE UP OR SHORTEN TIME

PROOF OF SERVICE - CIVIL

3/13/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE - CIVIL

SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO PLANTIFF'S PREVIOUSLY SUBMITTED DEFAULT PROVEUP DOCUMENTS.

5/5/2015: SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO PLANTIFF'S PREVIOUSLY SUBMITTED DEFAULT PROVEUP DOCUMENTS.

Minute Order -

8/21/2015: Minute Order -

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketAP1L1CATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH TRO RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; WITH DECLARATION OF GREGG GOLDFARB; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUBMITTED SEPARATELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEMCIVIL EXPARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH TR() RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEMCIVIL EXPARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketPoints and Authorities; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. COMPLAINT TO SET ASIDE FRAUDULENT CONVEYANCE [SECTION 3439.O7(A)]; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less