This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 15:25:57 (UTC).

ARZIE HENDERSON ET AL VS TINA C WANG ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/31/2012 ARZIE HENDERSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against TINA C WANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GAIL FEUER and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8435

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GAIL FEUER

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

MEDICAL STAFF OF OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER

OLYMIA MEDICAL CENTER

WANG TINA C

BIODGENT STEPHNIE. PA-C

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MORRIS EDWARD N. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

10/1/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/1/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/19/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

5/2/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/11/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/10/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

12/31/2012: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

SUMMONS -

12/31/2012: SUMMONS -

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 93, Gail Feuer, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal (FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR/PROSECUTE) - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 93, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; Trial (5-7 DAY ESTIMATE) - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department 93, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; Final Status Conference (TRIAL: 07/01/14) - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 93, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE) - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL STAFF OF OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD N. MORRIS