This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2016 at 22:09:27 (UTC).

ARTHUR MCCOVERY ET AL VS 3M COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/05/2014 ARTHUR MCCOVERY filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3860

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MCCOVERY ARTHUR

MCCOVERY OLIVIA

Defendants and Respondents

3M COMPANY

BEAZER EAST INC.

CBS CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

FOSECO INC.

VIACOM INC.

PACIFIC MECHANICAL SUPPLY

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

SWINDELL DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY

THE PEP BOYS-MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIF

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

LINK-BELT CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT COMP LLP

RUST INTERNATIONAL INC.

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DEBLASE BROWN EYERLY LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BASSI EDLIN HUIE & BLUM LLP

DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

DENTONS US LLP

FOLEY & MANSFIELD P.L.L.P

GORDON & REES LLP

K&L GATES LLP

LAW OFFICES OF GLASPY & GLASPY INC.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

LOMBARDI LOPER & CONANT LLP

MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LAW O/O

MCNAMARA NEY BEATTY SLATTERY BORGES &

NICHOLS STEPHEN M. ESQ.

PERKINS COIE LLP

POLSINELLI LLP

POND NORTH LLP

PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

SEDGWICK LLP

SELMAN & BREITMAN LLP LOS ANGELES

WFBM LLP SAN FRANCISCO

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/5/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/28/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/29/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/23/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/23/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/24/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/20/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/14/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/9/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/9/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/9/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/27/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/3/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

8/5/2014: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PERSQNAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

8/5/2014: COMPLAINT FOR PERSQNAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC MECHANICAL SUPPLY is a litigant

Latest cases where WTI RUST HOLDINGS INC. [DOE 1] is a litigant

Latest cases where LBCE Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOSECO, INC. is a litigant