This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 09:52:47 (UTC).

ARTHUR BORNER VS. MITCHELL WILLIAMS DBA SOLOMON'S TEMPLE

Case Summary

On 12/22/2016 ARTHUR BORNER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MITCHELL WILLIAMS DBA SOLOMON'S TEMPLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8648

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ARTHUR BORNER

BORNER ARTHUR

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MITCHELL WILLIAMS DBA SOLOMON'S TEMPLE

DOES 1-10 INCLUSIVE

SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY

WILLIAMS MITCHELL DBA SOLOMON'S TEMPLE

CALIFORNIA CONTRACTORS INSURANCE SERVICES

Not Classified By Court

FARASATPOUR JIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBIN D. PERRY ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

TOWNSEND RONNIE WILLIAM

Other Attorneys

PERRY ROBIN DWAYNE

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document

3/24/2017: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

5/10/2017: Case Management Statement

Notice of Continuance

7/24/2017: Notice of Continuance

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/31/2017: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order

9/28/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/1/2017: Minute Order

Notice of Continuance

1/31/2018: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order

3/19/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/23/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

4/23/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

5/23/2018: Legacy Document

Brief

6/1/2018: Brief

Notice of Ruling

6/11/2018: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document

7/17/2018: Legacy Document

Notice

7/18/2018: Notice

Minute Order

9/28/2018: Minute Order

Joinder

3/8/2019: Joinder

Minute Order

3/21/2019: Minute Order

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1385(b) and (c)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to California Rule...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (By Jim Farasatpour For A Court Order For Payment Of Fees Of Court Appointed Expert) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application By Jim Farasatpour For A Cour...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Declaration (Of Jim Farasatpour In Support Of Request For Court Order For Payment Of Fees Of Court Appointed Expert); Filed by Jim Farasatpour (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (By Jim Farasatpour For A Court Order For Payment Of Fees Of Court Appointed Expert; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities); Filed by Jim Farasatpour (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • at 09:09 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (Award) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Mitchell Williams (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by Mitchell Williams (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Mitchell Williams (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Answer; Filed by SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by ARTHUR BORNER (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by ARTHUR BORNER (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Civil Case Case Cover Sheet- Unlimited; Filed by ARTHUR BORNER (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less