Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2021 at 15:09:38 (UTC).

ARROWOOD INDEMNITY COMPANY VS REBECCA SNITILY

Case Summary

On 10/11/2016 ARROWOOD INDEMNITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REBECCA SNITILY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1622

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROWOOD INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendants

SNITILY REBECCA

SNITILY-ELMENDOR REBECCA

DOES 1 TO 10

SNITILY TIMOTHY D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GENNA DELANY

DELANY GENNA

 

Court Documents

Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE NOTICE OF AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 664.6 AND RESTORE CASE TO CIVIL ACTIVE LIST

10/20/2020: Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE NOTICE OF AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 664.6 AND RESTORE CASE TO CIVIL ACTIVE LIST

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KRISTEN P SLEEZER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCO SECTION 664.6 AND RESTORE CASE TO CIVIL AC

10/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KRISTEN P SLEEZER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCO SECTION 664.6 AND RESTORE CASE TO CIVIL AC

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/20/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE MOTION TO SET ASIDE NOTICE OF CON...) OF 12/03/2020

12/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE MOTION TO SET ASIDE NOTICE OF CON...) OF 12/03/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE MOTION TO SET ASIDE NOTICE OF CON...)

12/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE MOTION TO SET ASIDE NOTICE OF CON...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (Motion to Set Aside Notice of Conditional Settlement and Dismissal Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6 and Restore Case to Civil Active List) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Motion to Set Aside Notice of Con...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Vacate Motion to Set Aside Notice of Con...) of 12/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by ARROWOOD INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMotion to Vacate (Notice of and Motion to Set Aside Notice of Conditional Settlement and Dismissal Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6 and Restore case to civil active list); Filed by ARROWOOD INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Kristen P Sleezer in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Conditional Settlement and Dismissal Pursuant to CCO Section 664.6 and Restore Case to Civil Active List); Filed by ARROWOOD INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-11-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-04-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ARROWOOD INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ARROWOOD INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ARROWOOD INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ARROWOOD INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: YC071622    Hearing Date: December 03, 2020    Dept: M

***Tentative updated 12/3/20  7:54amSuperior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Southwest District

Torrance Dept. M

ARROWOOD INDEMNITY COMPANY,

Plaintiff,

Case No.:

YC071622

vs.

[Tentative] RULING

REBECCA SNITILY, et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: December 3, 2020

Moving Parties: Plaintiff Arrowood Indemnity Company

Responding Party: None

Motion to Set Aside Notice of Conditional Settlement and Dismissal Pursuant to CCP § 664.6 and Restore Case to Civil Active List

RULING

BACKGROUND

DISCUSSION

Plaintiff seeks a court order setting aside the notice of conditional settlement and dismissal pursuant to CCP § 664.6 and restoring the case to the civil active list.

Plaintiff acknowledges there is no written settlement agreement signed by all parties. Neither has it been shown that there was an oral agreement made before the court. One or the other is required for the court order to retain jurisdiction under CCP section 664.6 to be enforceable; Neither has occurred“Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6 provides a summary procedure to enforce a settlement agreement by entering judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement.”  Hines v. Lukes (2008) 167 Cal.App.4th 1174, 1182. CCP § 664.6 is a mechanism for entry of judgment and not for setting aside a notice of settlement or dismissal. Plaintiff is thus not entitled to such relief pursuant to CCP § 664.6.

Accordingly, the motion is denied.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arrowood Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELANY GENNA