This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 01:12:39 (UTC).

ARROW RECYCLING SOLUTIONS INC ET AL VS APPLIED UNDERWRITERS

Case Summary

On 05/16/2012 ARROW RECYCLING SOLUTIONS INC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against APPLIED UNDERWRITERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4846

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ARROW ENVIRONEMENTAL SOLUTIONS INC.

ARROW RECYCLING SOLUTIONS INC.

Defendants and Respondents

APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSUR

APPLIED UNDERWRITERS INC.

CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY

PATRIOT RISK AND INSURANCE SERVICES INC.

APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSUR-

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

ASSUR- APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK

Cross Defendants

TSIGRIS JOYCE

CAUSE INSURANCE SERVICES

R - T SPECIALITY INSURANCE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SIMMONS JEFFREY A. LAW OFFICES OF

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BARGER & WOLEN LLP

MORRIS POLICH & PURDY LAW O/O

HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP

CLARK HILL LLP

Cross Defendant Attorney

JAMES N. KNIGHT

 

Court Documents

CROSS-DEFENDANT R-T SPECIALTY, LLC'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT PATRIOT RISK & INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/16/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT R-T SPECIALTY, LLC'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT PATRIOT RISK & INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

7/13/2018: COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order -

8/8/2018: Minute Order -

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY SILVER IN SUPPORT OF APPLIED DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

5/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY SILVER IN SUPPORT OF APPLIED DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF DOUG KUNNEL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION/MOTION TO STAY

8/14/2012: DECLARATION OF DOUG KUNNEL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION/MOTION TO STAY

DECLARATION OF JEFFREY SIMMONS, #SQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION/MOTION TO STAY

8/14/2012: DECLARATION OF JEFFREY SIMMONS, #SQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION/MOTION TO STAY

STIPULATION (AND PROPOSED ORDER) TO CONTINUE DATES OF SEPTEMBER 24, 2012 OSC AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO OCTOBER 10, 2012 (WHEN THERE IS ANOTHER MATTER PENDING)

9/21/2012: STIPULATION (AND PROPOSED ORDER) TO CONTINUE DATES OF SEPTEMBER 24, 2012 OSC AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO OCTOBER 10, 2012 (WHEN THERE IS ANOTHER MATTER PENDING)

PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO NEW "EVIDENCE" SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS REGARDING DEFENDANTS? REPLY RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION [AND PROPOSED ORDER]

10/10/2012: PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO NEW "EVIDENCE" SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS REGARDING DEFENDANTS? REPLY RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION [AND PROPOSED ORDER]

NOTICE OF RULING

11/30/2012: NOTICE OF RULING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/10/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

STATUS OF PLEADINGS

9/18/2015: STATUS OF PLEADINGS

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

8/17/2016: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

SEPARATE STATEMENT OI DISPUTED RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF ARROW RECYCLING SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA INSURANCE CO. TO REQUESTS FOR PRODU

11/1/2016: SEPARATE STATEMENT OI DISPUTED RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF ARROW RECYCLING SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA INSURANCE CO. TO REQUESTS FOR PRODU

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF ARROW RECYCLING SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT APPLIED UNDERWRITERS, INC. TO FORM INTERROGATO

11/1/2016: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF ARROW RECYCLING SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT APPLIED UNDERWRITERS, INC. TO FORM INTERROGATO

DECLARATION OF JASON DANG IN SUPPORT OF ARROW RECYCLING SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM APPLIED UNDERWRITERS, INC., APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY, AND

11/2/2016: DECLARATION OF JASON DANG IN SUPPORT OF ARROW RECYCLING SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM APPLIED UNDERWRITERS, INC., APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY, AND

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

3/30/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

4/17/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

198 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 49; Non-Appearance Case Review (re confirmation of receipt of Proposed Judgment (per 10/2 m.o.)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketJudgment ((per Stipulation for Entry)); Filed by Applied Underwriters, Inc. (Defendant); Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assur- (Defendant); California Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 49; Non-Appearance Case Review (re confirmation of receipt of Proposed Judgment (per 10/2 m.o.)) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Lodging); Filed by Applied Underwriters, Inc. (Defendant); Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assur- (Defendant); California Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 49; Non-Appearance Case Review (re confirmation of receipt of Proposed Judgment (per 10/2 m.o.)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re confirmation of receipt of Prop...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 49; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement ((c/f 6/15 on court's own motion per m.o. of 5/29/20)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketOrder (RULING); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
460 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Arrow Recycling Solutions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Arrow Recycling Solutions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED COVENANT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Arrow Recycling Solutions, Inc. (Plaintiff); Arrow Environemental Solutions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC484846    Hearing Date: October 02, 2020    Dept: 49

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Arrow Recycling Solutions Inc, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

Case No.

BC484846

v.

[Tentative] Ruling

Applied Underwriters, Inc., et al.

Defendants.

Hearing Date: October 2, 2020

Department 49, Judge Stuart M. Rice

(1) Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and for Entry of Judgment

Moving Party:  Defendants/Cross-Complainants Applied Underwriters, Inc., Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc., California Insurance Company (“Defendants”)

Responding Party:      none

Ruling: Defendants’ unopposed motion for enforcement of and entry of judgment on settlement agreement is granted. Defendants are ordered to submit a proposed judgment consistent with this ruling for the court to sign and file.  

Here, the parties agreed in a written settlement agreement that plaintiffs/cross-defendants Arrow Recycling Services, Inc. and Arrow Environmental Services, Inc. (collectively, “Arrow”) would make monthly payments in the amount of $3,000 until it paid defendants a total of $77,000. (James Castle Decl., Exhibit C.) They further agreed that in the case of Arrow’s default on its payments, a judgment would be entered against it in the amount of $327,000, less any payments made, plus attorney fees and costs incurred in enforcing the settlement and 10% interest on the unpaid amount. (Id.) The subject agreement is signed by the parties and meets the requirements of Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6. Therefore, defendants’ motion for enforcement of and entry of judgment on the settlement agreement is granted under Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6.

Castle indicates that Applied has incurred attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $3,300 for 10 hours spent on this matter at his rate of $330/hour. The court finds the hours spent and Castle’s rate reasonable. Defendants shall fill in the blanks in the proposed stipulated judgment contained within exhibit D to Castle’s declaration, with interest calculated based on this hearing date, and submit the proposed judgment forthwith for this court to sign and file.

Date: October 2, 2020

Honorable Stuart M. Rice

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arrow Recycling Solutions, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PATRIOT RISK AND INSURANCE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where California Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Applied Underwriters, Inc is a litigant