This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 19:19:36 (UTC).

ARMANDO MORALES, ET-AL VS. ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2012 ARMANDO MORALES, ET-AL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ST FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM BARRY and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6745

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM BARRY

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

MORALES ARMANDO

VILLELA MICHELLE

Defendants

CHANG KAREN M.D.

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

KORANDO SARAH M.D.

RIVERSIDE COUNTY OF

ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MR. DAVID C. BYERS ESQ.

HEIMBERG BARR LLP

Defendant Attorneys

RINOS & MARTIN LLP

GONZALEZ & HULBERT LLP

RYAN DATOMI & MOSELY LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2013
  • Declaration (of James West re OSC re status of venue transfer & proof of payment of venue transfer fees ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • Notice of Ruling (RE: MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (civil deposit ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • Order (ORDER RE: DEFENDANT COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • Declaration Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2012
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Pet for Appt of Gdn Ad Litem - Ord (MICHELLE VILLELA appointed as GAL for Armando Morales ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.