Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 15:27:04 (UTC).

ARLENE JULIAN-PUNCH VS BRANDON CORY LOGAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 ARLENE JULIAN-PUNCH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRANDON CORY LOGAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7076

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JULIAN-PUNCH ARLENE

Defendants and Respondents

LOGAN BRANDON CORY

DOES 1 TO 20

POWELL IKEIYA H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FRIEDMAN LAW OFFICES

Defendant Attorney

MARK R. WEINER & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

10/12/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/12/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/16/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/16/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS IKEIYA H. POWELL AND BRANDON CORY LOGAN; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

11/28/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS IKEIYA H. POWELL AND BRANDON CORY LOGAN; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/1/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS IKEIYA H. POWELL AND BRANDON CORY LOGAN; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Brandon Cory Logan (Defendant); Ikeiya H. Powell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Arlene Julian-Punch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Arlene Julian-Punch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Arlene Julian-Punch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less