This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2016 at 18:13:35 (UTC).

ARISTIZABAL, JUAN PABLO GAVIRIA - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/05/2013 ARISTIZABAL, JUAN PABLO GAVIRIA - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COWAN, DAVID J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2038

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COWAN, DAVID J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PERICO HERBERT

Decedent

ARISTIZABAL JUAN PABLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AKBARI A. ILYAS ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2015
  • Order - Terminating Proceedings (Filed By: Perico, Herbert, Petitioner Repres By: Akbari, A. Ilyas, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Petition - Terminate Proceedings (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 06/04/2015 Filed By: Perico, Herbert, Petitioner Repres By: Akbari, A. Ilyas, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 2 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • Letters - Special Administrator (Full Authority 2013-06-06 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Issued To:: Perico, Herbert, Petitioner Repres By: Akbari, A. Ilyas, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • Order - Appointing Special Administrator (Filed By: Perico, Herbert, Petitioner Repres By: Akbari, A. Ilyas, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • Petition - Letters of Special Administration (EX PARTE Filed By: Perico, Herbert, Petitioner Repres By: Akbari, A. Ilyas, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • Court Supervision (Conversion Purpose)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • Declaration (Filed By: Perico, Herbert, Petitioner Repres By: Akbari, A. Ilyas, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKBARI A. ILYAS ESQ.