This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 23:13:42 (UTC).

ARIE ABEKASIS ET AL VS PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/23/2015 ARIE ABEKASIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2042

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Appellants

ABEKASIS ARIE

BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

363 N SWEETZER AVE LLC

612 N. FULLER AVE. LLC

616 N. FULLER AVE. LLC

AGAM JERRY

AGAM NATHAN

BIENENFELD AVI

PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC.

AGAM KAREN

HAYON RAFI

AGAM KIMBERLY

PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT CONSTRUCTION LLC

AGAM KIMBERLY DWOP

GUTTIERREZ SAUL ROE 75

GERSHONOV URI ROE 76

AGAM JERRY DWOP-7/11

616 N. FULLER AVE. LLC DISS W/OUT PREJ

AGAM KAREN DWOP

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Cross Defendants and Appellants

BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC.

RODAS TELMA

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LESLIE RICHARDS A P.C.

Defendant Attorney

GROSSBART KENNETH S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

1/17/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

1/17/2018: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Certificate of Mailing for

11/30/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

6/28/2016: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/12/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/18/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/20/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

7/21/2016: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/4/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT;ETC.

10/24/2016: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT;ETC.

PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO ARIE ABEKASIS' VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

11/23/2016: PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO ARIE ABEKASIS' VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/5/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

3/24/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

Minute Order

3/27/2017: Minute Order

CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OBJECTION TO THE FILING OF BELATED DECLARATION OF ROBERT SMITH SERVED ON APRIL 24,2017 IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

4/25/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OBJECTION TO THE FILING OF BELATED DECLARATION OF ROBERT SMITH SERVED ON APRIL 24,2017 IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

5/22/2017: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

5/31/2017: APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

REMITTITUR

10/30/2017: REMITTITUR

166 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • Appeal - Appendix CRC 8.124 Transcript Certified (NOA:06/07/19 B298292); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Arie Abekasis (Appellant); Brent Silver Construction, Inc. (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 6/7/19 ("R1")); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("R1"); Filed by Arie Abekasis (Appellant); Brent Silver Construction, Inc. (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Pacifica First National, Inc. (dem) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Notice ( of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Pacifica First National, Inc. (dem) (Defendant); Pacifica Development Construction,LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Order (re: Cross-Complainants' Request for Entry of Default Judgment); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
348 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2016
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Arie Abekasis (Plaintiff); Brent Silver Construction, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 612 N FULLER AVE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant