This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 15:29:24 (UTC).

ARGUS CONTRACTING LP VS BROADWAY CIVIC CENTER LP

Case Summary

On 01/02/2015 ARGUS CONTRACTING LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BROADWAY CIVIC CENTER LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RITA MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8251

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RITA MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARGUS CONTRACTING LP

Defendants and Respondents

BROADWAY CIVIC CENTER LP

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FINCH LAW

LAW FINCH

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/2/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

1/2/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

1/12/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/12/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

4/21/2015: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/7/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2015
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Argus Contracting, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Argus Contracting, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROADWAY CIVIC CENTER L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where ARGUS CONTRACTING LP is a litigant