Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2016 at 13:24:59 (UTC).

ARENA PAINTING CONTRACTORS, INC. VS CULP CONSTRUCTION CO.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2008 ARENA PAINTING CONTRACTORS, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CULP CONSTRUCTION CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDREW C. KAUFFMAN and MARY THORNTON HOUSE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7661

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANDREW C. KAUFFMAN

MARY THORNTON HOUSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARENA PAINTING CONTRACTORS INC.

Defendants

ROBERT MUNOZ

KOK HO

TOAETOLU BENNETT

INTRACORP

STIFF LEE V.

HO KOK

ALICANTE COMMUNITY CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 1000

BENNETT TOAETOLU

CULP CONTRACTORS COMPANY

BINU VAIDYAN

LEE V. STIFF

DOES 1 THROUGH 1000 INCLUSIVE

KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

JOHNNY CHEN

LEE ELLIS

DEBRA MCCURRY

TOEATOLU FUAMATALA

VAIDYAN BINU

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SCHILDBACH JENNIFER M.

LANAK & HANNA

Defendant Attorney

HERNANDEZ JESSE S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

7/3/2008: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR : 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. WORK LABOR SERVICE AND MATERIAL/AGREED PRICE; ETC

7/3/2008: COMPLAINT FOR : 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. WORK LABOR SERVICE AND MATERIAL/AGREED PRICE; ETC

NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION [CIVIL CODE 3172]

7/15/2008: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION [CIVIL CODE 3172]

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/25/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/9/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT , SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/9/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT , SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT , SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/9/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT , SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/12/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ROBERTO MUNOZ TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARENA PAINTING CONTRACTORS, INC.

9/25/2008: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ROBERTO MUNOZ TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARENA PAINTING CONTRACTORS, INC.

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS LEE ELLIS AND LINDA ELLIS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/25/2008: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS LEE ELLIS AND LINDA ELLIS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT KOK H. HO TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARENA PAINTING CONTRACTORS, INC.

9/25/2008: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT KOK H. HO TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARENA PAINTING CONTRACTORS, INC.

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BINU VAIDYAN TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARENA PAINTING CONTRACTORS, INC.

9/25/2008: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BINU VAIDYAN TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARENA PAINTING CONTRACTORS, INC.

ANSWER OF MANCHESTER & BELFORD TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/29/2008: ANSWER OF MANCHESTER & BELFORD TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

10/3/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/27/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/24/2008: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TAX COSTS; ETC

3/3/2009: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TAX COSTS; ETC

Minute Order

3/16/2009: Minute Order

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2009
  • Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO TAX COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • Notice (OF DEFTS' WITHDRAWAL OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • Notice of Continuance (OF MTN TO TAX COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • Motion to Tax Costs (; P'S AND A'S; DEC OF JENNIFER M. SCHILDBACH IN SUPP THEREOF BY PLTF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • Memorandum of Costs ($3,520.00 MOT. TO TAX COSTS 4/9/09 D 17 MEMO TO DEPT. 17 3/13/09 ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION (COMPLAINT) WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • Answer (OF DEFT LEE V. STIFF AND RENEE F. STIFF TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • Answer (OF DEFTS LEE ELLIS AND LINDA ELLIS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. ROBERT MUNOZ BY SUBSERV. ON AKIKO KOMORI; DECL. OF DUE DILIGENCE ATTACHED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. BINU VAIDYAN BY SUBSERV. ON JANE DOE; DECL. OF DUE DILIGENCE ATTACHED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY BY SERV. RANDALL HALE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2008
  • Notice (OF PENDING ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2008
  • Notice (OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2008
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2008
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARENA PAINTING CONTRACTORS INC. [MOE 1] is a litigant

Latest cases where KeyBank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHILDBACH, JENNIFER M