This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 12:54:20 (UTC).

ARDREDA JOHNSON VS FIRST NLC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 03/20/2015 ARDREDA JOHNSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FIRST NLC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROLF M. TREU, STEPHEN M. MOLONEY, JOHN P. DOYLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6027

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROLF M. TREU

STEPHEN M. MOLONEY

JOHN P. DOYLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JOHNSON ARDREDA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-25

FIRST NLC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEAL

12/19/2017: NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

12/20/2017: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING

1/4/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING

NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

1/24/2018: NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/9/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

APPLICATION, DECLARATION, AND ORDER TO SERVE THE SECRETARY OF STATE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CORPORATIONS CODE SECTION 1702(A)

4/10/2015: APPLICATION, DECLARATION, AND ORDER TO SERVE THE SECRETARY OF STATE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CORPORATIONS CODE SECTION 1702(A)

NOTICE OF REJECTION OF APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR SERVICE ON THE SECRETARY OF STATE.CORPORATIONS; LLCS

4/16/2015: NOTICE OF REJECTION OF APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR SERVICE ON THE SECRETARY OF STATE.CORPORATIONS; LLCS

Minute Order

8/19/2015: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

9/25/2015: FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/28/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

1/7/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/11/2016: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL CARRIGAN

3/2/2016: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL CARRIGAN

DECLARATION OF ARDREDA JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF QUIET TITLE JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P ? 585(D)

3/2/2016: DECLARATION OF ARDREDA JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF QUIET TITLE JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P ? 585(D)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

8/17/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT [CCP SECTION 473.5]

8/23/2017: DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT [CCP SECTION 473.5]

Minute Order

8/30/2017: Minute Order

JUDGMENT

10/27/2017: JUDGMENT

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • Appeal - Remittitur - Other (Affirmed in part and dismissed in part. B287054); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 58; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 58; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • APPLICATION, DECLARATION, AND ORDER TO SERVE THE SECRETARY OF STATE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CORPORATIONS CODE SECTION 1702(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. QUIET TITLE-CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 760.10- 765.060; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Ardreda Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC576027    Hearing Date: December 10, 2019    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: December 10, 2019

Case Name: Johnson v. PennyMac Corp.

Case No.: BC576027

Motion: Motions for Sanctions (2x)

Moving Party: Defendant PennyMac Corp.

Responding Party: Plaintiff Johnson

Tentative Ruling: The Motions for Sanctions are denied.


Defendant PennyMac Corp. brings two Motions for Sanctions, contending that Plaintiff’s two motions to set aside this Court’s August 30, 2017, order were without factual or legal support for the proposition that Plaintiff had experienced extrinsic fraud. (Code Civ. Proc. § 128.7.)

While Plaintiff’s motions lacked substantial merit, they did not quite rise to the level of frivolity. (See Peake v. Underwood (2014) 227 Cal.App.4th 428 [“A claim is objectively unreasonable if ‘any reasonable attorney would agree that [it] is totally and completely without merit.’ ”].) Accordingly, the Motions for Sanctions are denied.