This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 23:18:36 (UTC).

ARCHSTONE DISTRIBUTION LLC VS BIGGER EASY ENTERTAINMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 11/04/2015 ARCHSTONE DISTRIBUTION LLC filed an Other lawsuit against BIGGER EASY ENTERTAINMENT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8778

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARCHSTONE DISTRIBUTION LLC

Defendant and Respondent

BIGGER EASY ENTERTAINMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DONALD V. SMILEY

 

Court Documents

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

11/4/2015: PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

Minute Order

2/3/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

2/4/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

JUDGMENT

2/29/2016: JUDGMENT

Minute Order

2/29/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

3/7/2016: NOTICE OF ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Archstone Distribution, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Archstone Distribution, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • at 08:29 AM in Department 52; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Archstone Distribution, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCHSTONE DISTRIBUTION LLC is a litigant