This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2020 at 12:43:32 (UTC).

ARCHITECTURAL DOORS INC VS AAC DESIGNERS BUILDERS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/05/2009 ARCHITECTURAL DOORS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AAC DESIGNERS BUILDERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9059

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARCHITECTURAL DOORS INC.

Defendants and Respondents

AAC DESIGNERS BUILDERS INC.

AUSTIN AECOM COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 500

SUNLIFE HOLDINGS LLC.

SUNRIDER INTERNATIONAL (MALAYSIA) INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FIELDS C. KERRY ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PETERS WILLIAM J. ESQ.

SALAMONE MARY A. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/03/2015

DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2009

Docketat 08:30 am in Department 50, JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED CASES;2) INIT SC;3) CMC4) TSC) - Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2009

Docketat 08:30 am in Department 50, JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2009

DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2009

DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2009

DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2009

DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2009

DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT SUNRIDER INTERNATIONAL (MALAYSIA), INC. ONLY, WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2009

DocketAcknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2009

DocketAmendment to Complaint (DOE 1 SUNLIFE HOLDINGS, LLC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2009

DocketProof-Service/Summons (as to deft Sunrider International (Malaysia), Inc. ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2009

DocketProof-Service/Summons (AAC DESIGNERS BUILDER, INC. DBA AUSTIN AECOM CO. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2009

DocketProof-Service/Summons (AS TO DEFT PAUL MCCABE ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2009

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less