This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2019 at 16:04:47 (UTC).

ANTOINETTE SALAZAR VS SEDGWICK CLAIMS MGMT SVCS INC

Case Summary

On 08/28/2014 ANTOINETTE SALAZAR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SEDGWICK CLAIMS MGMT SVCS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, CAROLYN B. KUHL and CARL J. WEST. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6145

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

CAROLYN B. KUHL

CARL J. WEST

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SALAZAR ANTOINETTE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

SEDWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MARKHAM LAW FIRM THE

UNITED EMPLOYEES LAW GROUP

HAINES WALTER LEWIS

MARKHAM DAVID ROGER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WEINTRAUB GENSHLEA CHEDIAK

PLAMONDON LAW GROUP

CHEDIAK WEINTRAUB GENSHLEA

PLAMONDON SCOTT MICHAEL

MARKHAM DAVID R.

PLAMONDON SCOTT M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/6/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration

2/6/2019: Declaration

Notice of Motion

1/5/2018: Notice of Motion

Declaration

1/5/2018: Declaration

Declaration

1/5/2018: Declaration

Declaration

1/5/2018: Declaration

Declaration

1/5/2018: Declaration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/5/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/5/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/5/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

1/5/2018: Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

Minute Order

1/30/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Motion

2/13/2018: Notice of Motion

Declaration

2/13/2018: Declaration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/13/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Order

3/8/2018: Order

Minute Order

3/8/2018: Minute Order

Notice

3/13/2018: Notice

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (RE THE FILING OF THE FINAL DISTRIBUTION REPORT) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Antoinette Salazar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Ani S. Sarich of CPT Group, Inc. regarding Final Accounting and Disbursement of Class Action Settlement); Filed by Antoinette Salazar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 12; Fairness Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Antoinette Salazar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketOrder ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Antoinette Salazar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
179 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2014
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 322; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2014-12-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Antoinette Salazar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Antoinette Salazar (Plaintiff); Sedwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 322; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2014-10-06 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME COMPENSATION (LABOR CODE SECTION 510, 515, 1194, 1198); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Antoinette Salazar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant