This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 14:31:39 (UTC).

ANTHONY SIMMONS ET AL VS CITY OF LANCASTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2016 ANTHONY SIMMONS filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CITY OF LANCASTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5471

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RHOTEN JONATHAN

SUMMER YOKO

SIMMONS ANTHONY

SIMMONS MELISSA

SUMMER ALAN

BAXTER PAMELA

SABIH FAIZA

ESPINOZA CATHERINE

GILBERT BONITA

RHOTEN BROOK

ARTEAGA HILDA IBARRA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LOS ANGELES COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

PALMDALE CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC

LOS ANGELES COUNTY WATER WORKS DISTRICT

LANCASTER CITY OF

CITY OF LANCASTER

RESERVE AT LANCASTER LLC

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RESERVE AT LANCASTER LLC

CITY OF LANCASTER

RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF MARYLAND INC.

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PETERSON JOHN S. ESQ.

SCHWAR JOSEPH ALAN ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

GORDON MICHAEL J. ASSOC. COUNTY COUNSEL

RAMSEY CHRISTOPHER ESQ.

FORONDA DANTE

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MILLANE JAMES HOWARD

BALMUTH ROBERT LAWRENCE

LAU WENDY M.

ELLISON KYLE J.

Cross Defendant Attorney

JIKE RYAN RICHARD

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER I. CHO IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; EXHIBIT

1/24/2018: DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER I. CHO IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; EXHIBIT

RESPONSE TO MOVING PARTIES' SEPARATE STATEMENT ON THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC

1/24/2018: RESPONSE TO MOVING PARTIES' SEPARATE STATEMENT ON THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/24/2018: OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

RESERVE AT LANCASTER, LLC AND THE STRATHAM GROUP'S REPLY TO THE CITY OF LANCASTER'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/2/2018: RESERVE AT LANCASTER, LLC AND THE STRATHAM GROUP'S REPLY TO THE CITY OF LANCASTER'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

THE STRATHAM GROUP AND RESERVE AT LANCASTER, LLC'S OBJECTIONS TO CITY OF LANCASTER'S PROFFERED EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/2/2018: THE STRATHAM GROUP AND RESERVE AT LANCASTER, LLC'S OBJECTIONS TO CITY OF LANCASTER'S PROFFERED EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order

2/7/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS THE STRATHAM GROUP AND RESERVE AT LANCASTER LLC FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/8/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS THE STRATHAM GROUP AND RESERVE AT LANCASTER LLC FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE AND KIP, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO CITY OF LANCASTER'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/9/2018: NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE AND KIP, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO CITY OF LANCASTER'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/29/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESSES

4/3/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/3/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

KIP INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF RESERVE AT LANCA

4/16/2018: KIP INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF RESERVE AT LANCA

KIP INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/16/2018: KIP INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF RYAN JIKE IN SUPPORT OF KIP, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF RESERVE AT LANCASTER AND STRATHAM GROUP

4/16/2018: DECLARATION OF RYAN JIKE IN SUPPORT OF KIP, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF RESERVE AT LANCASTER AND STRATHAM GROUP

DECLARATION OF GREG QUIRENG IN SUPPORT OF KIP, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF RESERVE AT LANCASTER AND STRATHAM GROUP

4/16/2018: DECLARATION OF GREG QUIRENG IN SUPPORT OF KIP, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF RESERVE AT LANCASTER AND STRATHAM GROUP

KIP INC,'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF RESERVE AT LANCASTER AND STRATHAM GROUP

4/16/2018: KIP INC,'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF RESERVE AT LANCASTER AND STRATHAM GROUP

DECLARATION OF ERIC L. KELLY

4/16/2018: DECLARATION OF ERIC L. KELLY

VOLUME OF EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF RYAN R. JIKE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (VOLUME 1)

4/16/2018: VOLUME OF EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF RYAN R. JIKE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (VOLUME 1)

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (w/prejudice, City of Lancaster Cross-Complaint.); Filed by City of Lancaster (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hilda Ibarra Arteaga (Plaintiff); Pamela Baxter (Plaintiff); Catherine Espinoza (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by The Stratham Group (Cross-Complainant); Reserve at Lancaster, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Re Repayment Pursuant to Settlement Agreement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Re Repayment Pursuant to Settlement A...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (and Notice of Continuance of Order to Show Cause Re: Payment); Filed by PHB & ASSOCIATES, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Repayment Pursuant to Settlement Agreement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketNotice (of unavailability of counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
277 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Anthony Simmons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF FIRST PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF FIRST PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hilda Ibarra Arteaga (Plaintiff); Pamela Baxter (Plaintiff); Catherine Espinoza (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. INVERSE CONDEMNATION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

S0 W O 0 N O

ULICH GANION BALMUTH FISHER LLP

4041 MacArthur Blvd., Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

(949) 250-9797; Fax: (949) 250-9777

rbalmuth@ulichlaw.com; j ganion@ulichlaw com

LEiDé:amomia no Su oflfl{\,c&"l_m Angeles

NOV 22 2017

Sherri R. C xecutive Officer/Clerk By. Deputy

S den

Attomeys for Cross-Defendants/Cross- Complamants THE STRATHAM GROUP

and RESERVE AT LANCASTER LLC

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

ANTHONY SIMMONS; MELISSA SIMMONS; ALAN SUMMER; YOKO SUMMER; J ONATHAN RHOTEN; BROOK RHOTEN; BONITA GILBERT; CATHERINE ESPINOZA; DAVID BAXTER FAIZA SABIH and HILDA IBARRA ARTEAGA,

Plaintiffs, VS.

CITY OF LANCASTER; CITY OF PALMDALE;

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF

PUBLIC WORKS; LOS ANGELES COUNTY WATER WORKS DISTRICTS; LOS ANGELES COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT, and DOES 1 through 50, inclusive,

Defendants.

AND ALL RELATED CROSS-ACTIONS.

CASE NO. BC615471

Complaint filed: March 30, 2016 Judge: Susan Bryant-Deason Dept.: 52

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS RESERVE AT

LANCASTER, LLC AND THE

STRATHAM GROUP ON CROSS- COMPLAINT OF THE CITY OF

LANCASTER; MEMORANDUM OF

POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

[Filed concurrently with Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Declaration of Brandon Roth.]

Reservation ID No. 171116267601

DATE: February 7, 2018 TIME: 8:30 a.m. DEPT: 52‘

Trial Date: March 28, 2018

TO ALL PARTIES AND TO THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD HEREIN:

PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that on February 7, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 52 of the

above-entitled Court located at 111 N. Hill St.,

Los Angeles, California, Cross—Defendants,-

RESERVE AT LACANSTER, LLC (“Reserve”) and THE STRATHAM GROUP (“Stratham™),

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF RESERVE AT LANCASTER, LLC AND THE STRATHAM

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALMDALE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF MARYLAND INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LANCASTER CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LANCASTER is a litigant