Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 22:25:22 (UTC).

ANTHONY CARPENTER VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/17/2016 ANTHONY CARPENTER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0458

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CARPENTER ANTHONY

SHERIDAN PORNWARIN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

LONG BEACH COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH CENTER

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

JORDAN SHANNA M.D.

DOES 1 - 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STANLEY MARTIN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MONROY JON F. ESQ.

MONROY AVERBUCK & GYSLER

MONROY JON F.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/19/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE CONTINUANCE OF ASSIGNED DATES

2/5/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE CONTINUANCE OF ASSIGNED DATES

Minute Order

8/7/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/30/2018: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

12/10/2018: Stipulation and Order

Complaint

12/13/2018: Complaint

Answer

1/8/2019: Answer

Minute Order

1/10/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/17/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/26/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/22/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ORDER

7/10/2017: ORDER

Minute Order

7/10/2017: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF ANTHONY CARPENTER'S OPPOSITION TO DEENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF SET BY CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTION 2024.020

7/10/2017: PLAINTIFF ANTHONY CARPENTER'S OPPOSITION TO DEENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF SET BY CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTION 2024.020

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES; ETC.

7/10/2017: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES; ETC.

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

9/26/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [ AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES ] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

11/7/2017: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [ AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES ] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Status Conference (refiling of amended complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference; Status Conference re: filing of ame...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant); Long Beach Comprehensive Health Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Complaint ((1st)); Filed by Anthony Carpenter (Plaintiff); Pornwarin Sheridan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Stipulation and Order (Regarding Filing First amended Complaint); Filed by Anthony Carpenter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2016
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Anthony Carpenter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant); Long Beach Comprehensive Health Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Anthony Carpenter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Anthony Carpenter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Anthony Carpenter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC610458    Hearing Date: September 02, 2020    Dept: 29

Carpenter v. County of Los Angeles et al.

Motion for Relief from Dismissal by Plaintiff and Defendants by Stipulation is GRANTED. The dismissal entered on 3/2/20 is vacated.

The Court sets an OSC re dismissal for December 1, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONROY JON F.