This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 00:05:10 (UTC).

ANNETTE BEBICH ET AL VS GEORGE MATSUMOTO ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/27/2016 ANNETTE BEBICH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEORGE MATSUMOTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSS KLEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0748

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSS KLEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANNETTE BEBICH

JEANETTE GAMEZ

GAMEZ JEANETTE

BEBICH ANNETTE

Defendants

DOES 1 -10

GEORGE MATSUMOTO

MATSUMOTO GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEARNS KIM & STEARNS

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/19/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/17/2019: Unknown

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

1/17/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution

1/18/2019: Writ of Execution

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by ANNETTE BEBICH (Plaintiff); JEANETTE GAMEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by ANNETTE BEBICH (Plaintiff); JEANETTE GAMEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by ANNETTE BEBICH (Plaintiff); JEANETTE GAMEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Writ - Return; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Writ issued (WRIT OF EXECUTION TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY FOR ANNETTE BEBICH AND JEANETTE GAMEZ AGAINST GEORGE MATSUMOTO FOR $553,238.37 ); Filed by ATTORNEY FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Writ filed; Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Writ filed (ISSUED 08/01/17 ); Filed by ATTORNEY FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs (COSTS - $193.33 ACCRUED INTEREST - $51,525.00 ); Filed by ATTORNEY FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by ANNETTE BEBICH (Plaintiff); JEANETTE GAMEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default (PLNTF- ANNETTE BEBICH AND JEANETTE G A M E Z REQ FOR DEFAULT ON GEORGE MATSUMOTO :: REJECT RE - PLNTF NAME IS JEANETTE GAMEZ, NOT JEANETTE BEBICH (PLNTF 2 )); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P.S. SUMMONS, COMP, ETC. P .S. GEORGE MATSUMOTO SERVED SAME PERSONALLY 8-15-16 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ANNETTE BEBICH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ANNETTE BEBICH (Plaintiff); JEANETTE GAMEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P.S. SUMMONS, COMP ETC. P.S. GEORGE MATSUMOTO SERVED, PAULINE GALVAN, POA FOR GEORGE MATSUMOTO PERSONAL SERVICE 8-7-16 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by ANNETTE BEBICH (Plaintiff); JEANETTE GAMEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Summons Filed (ORIGINAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: NC060748    Hearing Date: February 20, 2020    Dept: S27

TENTATIVE RULING: grant

BACKGROUND

This motion arises out of a $501,496.40 judgment entered in Plaintiffs Annette Bebich and Jeanette Gamez’s (collectively “Plaintiffs”) favor against Defendant George Matsumoto (“Defendant”) for intentionally killing Marty Matsumoto.

Defendant is currently in a correctional facility.

Plaintiffs had been collecting payments made to a Chase Account on behalf of Defendant. These payments were being paid by the Pacific Maritime Association (“PMA”), though they suddenly stopped in November 2018.

Plaintiffs now request the Court to order Defendant to assign a right to PMA’s payment to them.

Defendant does not oppose. Defendant’s opposition was due on February 5, 2020, i.e., nine court days before this scheduled hearing. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1005, subd. (b).)

LEGAL STANDARD

Code of Civil Procedure, section 708.510, subdivision (a) states, in relevant part:

(a) Except as otherwise provided by law, upon application of the judgment creditor on noticed motion, the court may order the judgment debtor to assign to the judgment creditor or to a receiver appointed pursuant to Article 7 (commencing with Section 708.610) all or part of a right to payment due or to become due, whether or not the right is conditioned on future developments, including but not limited to the following types of payments:

(1) Wages dues from the federal government that are not subject to withholding under an earnings withholding order.

(2) Rents.

(3) Commissions.

(4) Royalties.

(5) Payments due from a patent or copyright.

(6) Insurance policy loan value.

Code of Civil Procedure section 708.510(c), further provides:

[I]n determining whether to order an assignment or the amount of an assignment pursuant to subdivision (a), the court may take into consideration all relevant factors, including the following:

(1) The reasonable requirements of a judgment debtor who is a natural person and of persons supported in whole or in part by the judgment debtor.

(2) Payments the judgment debtor is required to make or that are deducted in satisfaction of other judgments and wage assignments, including earnings assignment orders for support.

(3) The amount remaining due on the money judgment.

(4) The amount being or to be received in satisfaction of the right to payment that may be assigned.

DISCUSSION

The current balance due on the judgment is $586,613.96 and interest continues to accrue at 10 percent per annum. Plaintiffs request an assignment order of Defendant’s pension benefits that is being directed to Defendant that amount to approximately $3,000 per month.

The Court finds the assignment order appropriate and Defendant does not oppose.

CONCLUSION

The Court grants Plaintiffs’ motion for an assignment order.

Plaintiffs are to provide notice of this order.