This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2023 at 09:22:35 (UTC).

ANNE PEGULA VS LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2016 ANNE PEGULA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER and RAUL A. SAHAGUN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0591

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEGULA ANNE

ANNE PEGULA BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN

Defendants

IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE CENTER

LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC

LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC DBA IMPERIAL

JADEITE MANAGEMENT LLC

Guardian Ad Litems

PEGULA RONALD

RONALD PEGULA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANZONE MORGAN LLP

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL PER CRC RULE 8.124

1/24/2017: NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL PER CRC RULE 8.124

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

11/21/2016: APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

11/15/2016: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

NOTICE OF APPEAL

11/9/2016: NOTICE OF APPEAL

REMITTITUR

1/30/2018: REMITTITUR

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketProceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Holly J. Fujie 8:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Order to Show Cause Master Calendar 8:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketProceeding/Event Result:Order to Show Cause OSC Discharged

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-01 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketDocument:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCase Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 652 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketDocument:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketDocument:Remittitur Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:Order to Show Cause 03/01/18 at 8:30 am Master Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketSpecial Status Start:Personal Injury-Complicated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketCase Dispo/Manner:Transferred to LASC Southeast Dist. 10 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketDocument:Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketDocument:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketDocument:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketDocument:Ord-Appt of Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less