This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 03:39:04 (UTC).

ANNA MARIA THOMPSON VS OLIVIA CAROLEE CULBREATH ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/03/2016 ANNA MARIA THOMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OLIVIA CAROLEE CULBREATH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PETER A. HERNANDEZ and DUKES, ROBERT A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9035

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

DUKES, ROBERT A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

THOMPSON ANNA MARIE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

CULBREATH LISA

CULBREATH OLIVIA CAROLEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HIGUERA LAW OFFICES APLC

HIGUERA JOSEPH GLENN

HIGUERA JOSEPH G. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

GRANDY JAMES LAWTON

GONTER K. ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/3/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Related Case

2/10/2016: Notice of Related Case

Unknown

2/10/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

3/10/2017: Minute Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/16/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Unknown

7/10/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

8/10/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/8/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/19/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/27/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice

10/9/2018: Notice

Minute Order

1/10/2019: Minute Order

Answer

3/14/2019: Answer

SUMMONS

2/3/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/3/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET UNLIMITED

2/10/2016: AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET UNLIMITED

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/10/2016: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order

3/10/2017: Minute Order

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Lisa Culbreath (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Olivia Carolee Culbreath (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why stay should not be lifted and status of pending Motions and status of Criminal Proceedings) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Minute Order ((Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why stay s...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Anna Marie Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; (Order to Show Cause) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; (Settlement Conference) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Minute Order ((Status Hearing; Order to Show Cause Re: why stay should not b...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Anna Marie Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Anna Marie Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET UNLIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Anna Marie Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anna Marie Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC609035    Hearing Date: January 29, 2020    Dept: O

Defendant Olivia Culbreath’s motion to deem requests for admissions admitted is GRANTED.

Defendant Olivia Culbreath (“Defendant”) moves for an order deeming its requests for admission (set 1), propounded on Plaintiff Eusebio Delgado (“Plaintiff”), admitted pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 2033.280.

Section 2033.280(b) and (c) allow the propounding party to file a motion requesting that the truth of any matters specified in the request for admissions be deemed admitted unless the party to whom the requests have been directed has served before the hearing a proposed response that is in substantial compliance.

Section 2023.010(d) authorizes the court to impose sanctions for failure to respond to discovery without substantial justification. Section 2033.280 makes the imposition of sanctions mandatory if a party fails to serve a timely response to requests for admission.

On October 8, 2019, Defendant served her Request for Admissions, Set One at Plaintiff’s last known address. (Brunello Decl., ¶¶ 5-7.) At the time Defendant filed and served these motions, it still has not received any responses to its discovery requests from Plaintiff. (Id. at ¶ 15.) The Court also notes that it did not receive an opposition from Plaintiff, and presumably, Defendant still has not received responses from Plaintiff either.

This motion, then, is GRANTED.