This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 02:37:39 (UTC).

ANITA BRALOCK VS AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES INC

Case Summary

On 03/25/2016 ANITA BRALOCK filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL JOHNSON, J. STEPHEN CZULEGER, BARBARA M. SCHEPER and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4955

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL JOHNSON

J. STEPHEN CZULEGER

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BRALOCK ANITA

Defendants and Respondents

JOHNSON GREGORY

DOES 1-50

AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES

Not Classified By Court

GIGER JOYCE NEWMAN

NON-PARTY DR. JOYCE NEWMAN GIGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF TWILA S. WHITE

WHITE TWILA S

JACKSON IVERSON MATTHEW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

THOMPSON ROBERT W. ESQ

TYSON & MENDES LLP

SILVA REGINA

THOMPSON ROBERT WALTER

 

Court Documents

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL MENTAL EXAMINATIONS OF PLAINTIFFS ANITA BRALOCK AND BRANDON FRYMAN

1/3/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL MENTAL EXAMINATIONS OF PLAINTIFFS ANITA BRALOCK AND BRANDON FRYMAN

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

3/22/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Unknown

4/2/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF LODGING REGARDUG DEFENDANT AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCE, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION TO PLAINTIFF BRANDON FRYMAN?S FIRST AMENDED

5/24/2018: NOTICE OF LODGING REGARDUG DEFENDANT AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCE, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION TO PLAINTIFF BRANDON FRYMAN?S FIRST AMENDED

Order

11/14/2018: Order

Motion in Limine

1/24/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

1/24/2019: Motion in Limine

Notice

2/1/2019: Notice

Declaration

2/1/2019: Declaration

Opposition

2/1/2019: Opposition

Declaration

2/6/2019: Declaration

Reply

2/7/2019: Reply

Witness List

2/11/2019: Witness List

Minute Order

6/7/2019: Minute Order

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/21/2016: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/29/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF KIM DANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, AGAINST PLAINTIFFS ANITA BRALOCK AND

11/9/2017: DECLARATION OF KIM DANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, AGAINST PLAINTIFFS ANITA BRALOCK AND

NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENA FOR NON-PARTY DR. JOYCE NEWMAN GIGER AND OPPOSITION THERETO; ETC

11/29/2017: NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENA FOR NON-PARTY DR. JOYCE NEWMAN GIGER AND OPPOSITION THERETO; ETC

349 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Mandatory Settlement Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Mandatory Settlement Conference) of 06/07/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Long Cause Determination) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Long Cause Determination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 16, J. Stephen Czuleger, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Stipulation to Pre-screen Jurors Due to Economic Hardship Based on Juror's Jury Leave Benefit and Other Hardships; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Anita Bralock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Request for Dismissal ((Partial Dismissal - Plaintiff's 4th Cause of Action)); Filed by Anita Bralock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Request for Dismissal ((Partial Dismissal - Plaintiff's 5th Cause of Action)); Filed by Anita Bralock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
610 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF PETITION AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF SARAH E. CHRISTENSON; DECLARATION OF AMA PINEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Anita Bralock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Anita Bralock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • PLAINTIFF S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) VIOLATION OF TITLE IX; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Anita Bralock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES is a litigant