This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 09:50:02 (UTC).

ANH LE HUYNH VS. SUPER A FOODS, INC.,

Case Summary

On 06/01/2011 ANH LE HUYNH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SUPER A FOODS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAN A. PLUIM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7459

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAN A. PLUIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUYNH ANH LE

Defendants

DBA SUPER A FOODS INC.

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

SUPER A FOODS INC.

MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON

Not Classified By Court

BAUM RICHARD T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY LLP

Defendant Attorney

MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ANH LE HUYNH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (AS TO ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by ANH LE HUYNH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • DocketNotice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Agreement (Full)) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department ADR, ADR Clerk, Presiding; Closed-ADR - Agreement (Full)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • DocketStatement-Agreement (Full); Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • DocketStatement-Agreement (Full) (FIRST SANA FILED MEDIATION ENDED IN FULL AGREEMENT ); Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2011
  • DocketNotice (CASE MANAGEMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ANH LE HUYNH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • DocketNotice; Filed by ANH LE HUYNH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SUPER A FOODS, INC., (Defendant); MILLARD, HOLWEGER, CHILD & MARTON (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by ANH LE HUYNH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANH LE HUYNH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPER A FOODS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant