This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2020 at 06:33:47 (UTC).

ANGELITA MONZON VS ENSIGN FACILITY SERVICES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/17/2011 ANGELITA MONZON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ENSIGN FACILITY SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1771

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONZON ANGELITA

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 100

ENSIGN FACILITY SERVICES INC.

ENSIGN GROUP INC. THE

ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC

FLAKE MATT

WHITTIER HILLS HEALTH CARE CENTER

YAMUL ANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEIDMANN MARK ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MCCLELLAN EDISON ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

6/1/2011: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/1/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/9/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/9/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/6/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/25/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

8/8/2011: Minute Order -

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPTCIVIL

9/6/2011: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPTCIVIL

Minute Order -

9/19/2011: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MATT FLAKES DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ANAHIT GALSTYAN; EXHIBITS

10/11/2011: PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MATT FLAKES DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ANAHIT GALSTYAN; EXHIBITS

DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

10/17/2011: DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

10/24/2011: Minute Order -

I. NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ANCELITA MONZON; AND 2, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND? AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

12/21/2011: I. NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ANCELITA MONZON; AND 2, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND? AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

Minute Order -

2/2/2012: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFF?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DESABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; (2) RETALLAT1ON FOR REQUESTS FOR ACCOMMODATION, COMPLAINTS OF DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION [N VIO

2/7/2012: PLAINTIFF?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DESABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; (2) RETALLAT1ON FOR REQUESTS FOR ACCOMMODATION, COMPLAINTS OF DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION [N VIO

DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ANGELITA MONZON

2/17/2012: DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ANGELITA MONZON

Minute Order -

4/30/2012: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

5/22/2012: Minute Order -

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2012
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71; (Trial; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Angelita Monzon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71; (Trial; Proceeding continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Proceeding continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Proceeding continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Proceeding continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Angelita Monzon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Angelita Monzon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Angelita Monzon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angelita Monzon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ENSIGN SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ENSIGN GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant