This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 19:34:06 (UTC).

ANGELINE DATINGALING VS RICHARD MILIAN, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 10/15/2012 ANGELINE DATINGALING filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RICHARD MILIAN, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, GREGORY KEOSIAN and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6926

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DATINGALING ANGELINE

Defendants

CONTINENTAL BUSINESS MAINTENANCE

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

MILIAN RICHARD

RICARDO MAINTENANCE INC.

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALIWODA & PALIWODA LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

HALAS & MUHAR

 

Court Documents

AIR UAAIUR -I J UJMI LI-I (1JUII TWO, WILLFUL FAILURE TO WARN AND 1,4 COUNT THREE-DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS FROM PREMISES LIABILITY CAUSE OP ACTJON

4/9/2013: AIR UAAIUR -I J UJMI LI-I (1JUII TWO, WILLFUL FAILURE TO WARN AND 1,4 COUNT THREE-DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS FROM PREMISES LIABILITY CAUSE OP ACTJON

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/11/2013: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/11/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

4/11/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

Unknown

4/24/2013: Unknown

Unknown

4/29/2013: Unknown

Minute Order

5/15/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

4/1/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

4/3/2014: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/25/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (W/PREJ, ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Proof of Service ( re: Ntc of Case Reassignmen t ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Stipulation (TO DISMISS L-3 COUNT TWO, ETC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice (ITEM 3A FILLED OUT INCORRECTLY ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Notice (OF REJECTION PROOF OF SERVICE NO PARTY NAMED; ONLY PROVIDED THE AGENT FOR SERVICE ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.