This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 13:04:35 (UTC).

ANGELA AUER VS ALLIANCE UNITED PARKING SYSTEMS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 ANGELA AUER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLIANCE UNITED PARKING SYSTEMS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0228

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AUER ANGELA

Defendants and Respondents

ABC VALET PARKING

ALLIANCE UNITED PARKING SYSTEMS LLC

DOES 1-10

VELARDE JAIME ARTURO (DOE 1)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ARIAS OZZELLO & GIGNAC LLP

THE OZZELLO PRACTICE PC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HOROWITZ ALAN M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/27/2014: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

6/27/2014: SUMMONS

APPLICATION FOR ORDER THAT SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALLAIANCE SYSTEMS, LLC, DBA, ABC VALET PARKING BE EFFECTED BY SERVICE UPON THE SECRETARY OF STATE

9/24/2015: APPLICATION FOR ORDER THAT SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALLAIANCE SYSTEMS, LLC, DBA, ABC VALET PARKING BE EFFECTED BY SERVICE UPON THE SECRETARY OF STATE

NOTICE OF REJECTION OF APPLICAT1ON AND ORDER FOR SERVICE ON THE SECRETARY OF STATE-CORPORATIONS; LLCS

10/1/2015: NOTICE OF REJECTION OF APPLICAT1ON AND ORDER FOR SERVICE ON THE SECRETARY OF STATE-CORPORATIONS; LLCS

NOTICE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUATION OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

12/9/2015: NOTICE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUATION OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

DECLARATION OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUATION OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

12/9/2015: DECLARATION OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUATION OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/9/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

12/9/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

12/9/2015: Minute Order

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/11/2015: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUATION OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

12/17/2015: NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUATION OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR MARK OZZELLO

12/23/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR MARK OZZELLO

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ALAN M. HORWITZ

2/1/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ALAN M. HORWITZ

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

2/4/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

Minute Order

2/18/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SETTING OF HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY

2/18/2016: NOTICE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SETTING OF HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY

DECLARTION OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SETTING OF HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY

2/18/2016: DECLARTION OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SETTING OF HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/26/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • Notice-Settlement (CONDITIONAL ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Declaration Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint (doe 1: Jaime Arturo Velarde ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Declaration (OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUATION OF FSC AND TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application (NOTICE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUATION OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR ORDER THAT SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALLIANCE SYSTEMS, LLC DBA ABC VALET PARKING BE EFFECTED BY SERVICE UPON THE SECRETARY OF STATE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Application-Miscellaneous (SERVICE ON DEFNDANT ALLAINCE SYSTEMS,LLC DBA ABC VALET PARKING BE WEFFECTED BY SERVICE UPON THE SECRETARY OF STATE RECEIPT #LAC484380024 $20.00 9-25-15) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE UNITED PARKING SYSTMES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORWITZ ALAN M