Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2021 at 19:20:10 (UTC).

ANDREW LEE SIMPSON V. PATRIOT ENVIRONMENTAL LAB SERVICES

Case Summary

On 02/04/2014 ANDREW LEE SIMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PATRIOT ENVIRONMENTAL LAB SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL, MICHAEL P. VICENCIA, DANIEL S. MURPHY, ROSS KLEIN, DAVID SOTELO and BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5232

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

DANIEL S. MURPHY

ROSS KLEIN

DAVID SOTELO

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SIMPSON ANDREW LEE

ANDREW LEE SIMPSON

LEE SIMPSON ANDREW

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

LANGENWALTER JEFFREY LEE

PATRIOT ENVIRONMENTAL LABORATORY SERVICES

PATRIOT ENVIROMENTAL LABORATORY SEVICES

JEFFREY LEE LANGENWALTER

DOES 1 TO 10

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER RAMSEY

LEE LANGENWALTER JEFFREY

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

STOLL NUSSBAUM & POLAKOV APC

STOLL NUSSBAUM & POLAKOV LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER RAMSEY

RAFFALOW RHOADS & BRETOI

LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER RAMSEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order (Motion for Protective Order; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department B; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department B, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Motion for Protective Order (1.) PREVENTING DEPO & PROD OF DOCS2.) PREVENTING DEPO & PROD OF DOCS3.) PREVENTING DEPO & PROD OF DOCS2-MTN TO QUASH SUBPOENAS CONT TO11/22/16 BY PLNTF ATTORNEY 10/11) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Docketat 03:00 pm in Department B, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Court Order - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketNotice-Settlement (NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
289 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketComplaint Filed (SUMMONS ISSUED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andrew Lee Simpson (Plaintiff); SIMPSON ANDREW LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andrew Lee Simpson (Plaintiff); SIMPSON ANDREW LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketSummons; Filed by SIMPSON ANDREW LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PATRIOT ENVIRONMENTAL LABORATORY SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMSEY CHRISTOPHER