This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2016 at 00:16:08 (UTC).

ANDREW KIM VS DESIGN BY NATURE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/03/2014 ANDREW KIM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DESIGN BY NATURE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6644

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM ANDREW

Defendants and Respondents

DESIGN BY NATURE LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

FANG CLOTHING

FASHION LIFE INC.

FASTMAKER LLC

ITEX

KIM KERRI

KIM KYUNG HEE

KIM TONG HUN

KIM TONY T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRY M. LEE LAW CORPORATION

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PARK DANIEL M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

9/3/2014: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

9/3/2014: COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/9/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER

1/16/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER

DEFENDANT DESIGN BY NATURE LLC'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF ANDREW KIM TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

1/30/2015: DEFENDANT DESIGN BY NATURE LLC'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF ANDREW KIM TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

DEFENDANT DESIGN BY NATURE LLC, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF ANDREW KIM TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, ETC.

1/30/2015: DEFENDANT DESIGN BY NATURE LLC, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF ANDREW KIM TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, ETC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

3/5/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF LILIUOKALANI HASLOP

7/31/2015: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF LILIUOKALANI HASLOP

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER; ETC.

8/12/2015: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER; ETC.

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S DESIGN BY NATURE, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/13/2015: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S DESIGN BY NATURE, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE WITHOUT OBJECTIONS AND FOR THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS

10/29/2015: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE WITHOUT OBJECTIONS AND FOR THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE WITHOUT OBJECTIONS AND FOR THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS

10/29/2015: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE WITHOUT OBJECTIONS AND FOR THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE WITHOUT OBJECTIONS AND FOR THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS

10/29/2015: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE WITHOUT OBJECTIONS AND FOR THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND IMPOSITION OF MONETARY, ISSUE, EVIDENCE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF, ETC

1/14/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND IMPOSITION OF MONETARY, ISSUE, EVIDENCE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF, ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE, OR FOR AN ORDER DEEMING THEM ADMITTED; AND IMPOSITION OF MONETARY OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF

1/14/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE, OR FOR AN ORDER DEEMING THEM ADMITTED; AND IMPOSITION OF MONETARY OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT DESIGN BY NATURE, LLC'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF ANDREW KIM TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE

1/14/2016: DEFENDANT DESIGN BY NATURE, LLC'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF ANDREW KIM TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL, FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE, AND IMPOSITION OF MONETARY, ISSUE, EVIDENCE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF; ETC

1/14/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL, FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE, AND IMPOSITION OF MONETARY, ISSUE, EVIDENCE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF; ETC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/3/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2016
  • Motion to Compel Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Opposition Document Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • Second Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Opposition Document Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Motion to Compel Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FASTMAKER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ITEX Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Fashion Life, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Design by Nature, LLC is a litigant