This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 06:04:44 (UTC).

ANDREW FLORES VS THE ENSIGN GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 08/27/2015 ANDREW FLORES filed an Other lawsuit against THE ENSIGN GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2768

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FLORES ANDREW

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

ENSIGN GROUP INC. THE

WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

JOEL BECKMAN INC. A LAW CORPORATION

Defendant Attorney

SHEPHARD ROBERT

 

Court Documents

THE ENSIGN GROUP INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

1/9/2018: THE ENSIGN GROUP INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/26/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

8/27/2015: SUMMONS

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1.SURVIVAL ACTION FOR INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; ETC

8/31/2015: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1.SURVIVAL ACTION FOR INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; ETC

Minute Order

2/9/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/27/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/27/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/28/2017: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

5/17/2017: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

5/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

5/17/2017: OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

5/31/2017: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

6/9/2017: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

DEFENDANTS' AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

7/6/2017: DEFENDANTS' AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST?CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

8/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST?CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

8/1/2017: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order

8/16/2017: Minute Order

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/5/2017: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 55; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 55; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 55; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Andrew Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Ensign Group, Inc., The (Defendant); Whittier Hills Healthcare Center (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Statement of Facts; Filed by Ensign Group, Inc., The (Defendant); Whittier Hills Healthcare Center (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • THE ENSIGN GROUP INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY DEFENDANT, THE ENSIGN GROUP, INC.; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Ensign Group, Inc., The (Defendant); Whittier Hills Healthcare Center (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Andrew Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; No Appearance) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Andrew Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1.SURVIVAL ACTION FOR INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Andrew Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1: MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ENSIGN GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant