Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 00:05:41 (UTC).

ANDREJ USTACH VS C & H TRUST DEED SERVICE ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/22/2016 ANDREJ USTACH filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against C H TRUST DEED SERVICE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7922

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

USTACH ANDREJ

Defendants and Respondents

C & H TRUST DEED SERVICE

DOES 1-20

CHUNG HYUN JI

LIM JONG OK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SAM KIM AND ASSOCIATES APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HALAVAIS COBY R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/11/2016: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/17/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/24/2016: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

4/7/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

5/13/2016: ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

6/3/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

9/16/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Unknown

9/30/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

11/23/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: INCONSISTENT AND CONSISTENT EVIDENCE OF THE AMOUNT OF THE LOAN IS STATUTORILY BARRED.

12/12/2016: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: INCONSISTENT AND CONSISTENT EVIDENCE OF THE AMOUNT OF THE LOAN IS STATUTORILY BARRED.

Minute Order

12/15/2016: Minute Order

DEFENDANT'S SUR-REPLY BRIEF.

3/7/2017: DEFENDANT'S SUR-REPLY BRIEF.

Minute Order

4/14/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/2/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANT JONG OK LIM'S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR A NEW TRIAL.

8/15/2017: DEFENDANT JONG OK LIM'S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR A NEW TRIAL.

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

10/4/2017: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

10/5/2017: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DEFENDANT JONG OK LIM S SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HER OPPOSITION TO FEES & COSTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • REPLY OF PLAINTIFF ANDRZEJ USTACH IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Notice of Designation of Record; Filed by Jong Ok Lim (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Motion Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2016
  • NOTICE RECORDATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Andrej Ustach (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ANDRZEJ USTACH FOR: (1) INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC607922    Hearing Date: January 13, 2021    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: January 13, 2021

Case Name: Ustach v. C&H Trust Deed Service, et al.

Case No.: BC607922

Matter: Motion for Attorneys’ Fees and Costs

Moving Party: Plaintiff Andrej Ustach

Responding Party: Unopposed


Tentative Ruling: The Motion for Attorneys’ Fees and Costs is granted.


Plaintiff seeks $90,791.43 in attorneys’ fees and costs from Defendant Jong Ok Lim. Plaintiff contends he is the prevailing party and that the subject promissory note allows for fees.

As the Motion is unopposed, it is granted. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 8.54(c); Sexton v. Superior Court (1997) 58 Cal.App.4th 1403, 1410.)

Case Number: BC607922    Hearing Date: October 19, 2020    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: October 19, 2020

Case Name: Ustach v. C&H Trust Deed Service, et al.

Case No.: BC607922

Matter: (1) Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

(2) Motion for Attorneys’ Fees and Costs

Moving Party: (1) Brian Shumake, counsel for Defendant Jong Ok Lim

(2) Plaintiff Andrej Ustach

Responding Party: (1) (2) Unopposed


Tentative Ruling: The Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is granted.

See Below re: Motion for Attorneys’ Fees and Costs


  1. Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Brian Shumake seeks to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Jong Ok Lim. The Motion is granted because it meets all requirements of Cal. Rules of Court, Rule. 3.1362.

  1. Motion for Attorneys’ Fees and Costs

Plaintiff seeks $90,791.43 in attorneys’ fees and costs from Defendant Jong Ok Lim. Plaintiff contends he is the prevailing party and that the subject promissory note allows for fees.

The Motion was served on (1) Brian Schumake and (2) Jeremy Cook, both of whom are labeled as Defendant’s counsel. However, Brian Shumake has withdrawn as counsel and states that he has not actually represented Defendant for three years and that it is believed Defendant moved to South Korea. Additionally, the Court is not aware of Jeremy Cook’s involvement in this action. Thus, it is not apparent to the Court that Defendant was actually served with the Motion. This will be discussed at the hearing. Assuming there was service, the Motion will be granted. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 8.54(c); Sexton v. Superior Court (1997) 58 Cal.App.4th 1403, 1410.)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C & H TRUST DEED SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALAVAIS COBY RICHARD