Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 10:56:54 (UTC).

ANDREA VARGAS, ET AL VS. YOLANDA GALLIZZI

Case Summary

On 10/26/2016 ANDREA VARGAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YOLANDA GALLIZZI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8423

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

VARGAS ANDREA

GARCIA ANA

Defendant and Respondent

GALLIZZI YOLANDA

Other

LAW OFFICES OF ALLISON M. SCHULMAN

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF SUZANNE F. GOULDING APC

PIMENTAL LAW

PC PIMENTEL LAW

ALLISON M. SCHULMAN LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RAFFALOW RHOADS & BRETOI

THORDARSON DUSTIN ERIC

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

10/26/2016: PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECLASSIFACTION INTO UNLIMITED JURISDICTION; ETC

10/26/2016: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECLASSIFACTION INTO UNLIMITED JURISDICTION; ETC

RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD

10/26/2016: RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF, ANA GARCIA, IN PRO PER, TO (1) RESPOND TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS,; ETC

10/26/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF, ANA GARCIA, IN PRO PER, TO (1) RESPOND TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS,; ETC

ORDER GRANTING ATRORNEY?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

10/26/2016: ORDER GRANTING ATRORNEY?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

10/26/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUMMONS

10/26/2016: SUMMONS

[PROPOSED] JOINT WITNESS LIST

7/14/2017: [PROPOSED] JOINT WITNESS LIST

JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

7/14/2017: JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

Minute Order

7/17/2017: Minute Order

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF RECORDS

7/26/2017: OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF RECORDS

PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RECORDS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

7/28/2017: PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RECORDS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL RECORDS

8/8/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL RECORDS

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 TO LIMIT PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL SPECIALS

9/27/2017: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 TO LIMIT PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL SPECIALS

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OR ETC

9/27/2017: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OR ETC

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TAX COSTS IN MEMORANDUM OF COSTS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREA VARGAS; ETC.

12/6/2017: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TAX COSTS IN MEMORANDUM OF COSTS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREA VARGAS; ETC.

Unknown

1/22/2018: Unknown

Notice

5/21/2019: Notice

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • Notice (of Handling Attorney Change); Filed by Yolanda Gallizzi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Plaintiff's Objections to Amended Judgment; Filed by Andrea Vargas (Plaintiff); Ana Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIP ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; (Motion Hearing; Granted in Part) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Opposition Document; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Motion for an Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
221 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2016
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Points and Authorities; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Stipulation; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Motion; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Opposition Document; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Reply to Opposition; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Minute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Receipt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Receipt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC638423    Hearing Date: February 19, 2021    Dept: 28

 Plaintiff's motions to compel further responses from Defendant to Andrea Vargas' and Ana Garcia's 3rd and 4th sets of Requests for Admission are granted.  Defendant is to respond to each request with either an admission or a denial, without objections, with in 20 days.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant