This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2016 at 04:01:52 (UTC).

ANDREA NORTH VS RANDY RITCHEY

Case Summary

On 11/19/2008 ANDREA NORTH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RANDY RITCHEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MINTO, R. BRUCE and DUKES, ROBERT A.. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4336

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2008

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MINTO, R. BRUCE

DUKES, ROBERT A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH ANDREA

Defendants

PERFORMANCE ASSOCIATES

RITCHEY RANDY

Cross Defendant

THOM TIMOTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GRANADO BRENT A. ESQ

MADONI STEPHEN A. LAW OFFICES OF

Cross Defendant Attorney

NEWMAN ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2009
  • DocketReceipt (FIR DOCUMENTS TRANSFERRED ORANGE COUNTY #00325832 ) Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • DocketStipulation and Order (CONSOLIDATION WITH ORANGE COUNTY CASE 07CC11434 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (TENTATIVE RULING ) Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • DocketReply To Motion Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint (TIMOTHY THOM ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • DocketOpposition Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketDefault Entered Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (TIMOTHY THOM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2009
  • DocketOpposition (to Demurrer ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2009
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2008
  • DocketAnswer and Cross-Complaint Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2008
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (Randy Ritchey, an individual ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2008
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • DocketCross-complaint filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • DocketSummons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less