This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 18:19:03 (UTC).

ANCELMA SANCHEZ VS VINCENTE SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 08/24/2016 ANCELMA SANCHEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VINCENTE SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTIAN, H. DON and BLADES, STEVEN D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5832

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTIAN, H. DON

BLADES, STEVEN D.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANCHEZ ANCELMA

Respondent

SANCHEZ VINCENTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NOGUEDA NORMA NELLY

Respondent Attorney

LAWSON BEATRICE R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Notice - Continuance (No Fee); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2016
  • Miscellaneous (Court Reporter Fee - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sanchez, Ancelma ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Petition - Amended (1st) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sanchez, Ancelma ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Summons - Amended (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sanchez, Ancelma ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sanchez, Ancelma - Granted on 2016-08-24 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sanchez, Ancelma ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sanchez, Ancelma ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sanchez, Ancelma ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOGUEDA NORMA NELLY